Federal Ins. Co. v. Whirlpool Corp., et al.,
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation and 3M Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv01678
Filed: July 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/10/2017 ORDERING the deadline for Discovery is EXTENDED to 4/11/2017 solely to allow for the taking of the depositions of Defendant 3M Company's Person(s) Most Knowledgeable. (Washington, S)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/2/2017 ORDERING that plaintiff's 24 Motion to Compel is DENIED without prejudice and the 3/8/2017 hearing is VACATED. (Zignago, K.)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/28/16: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 5/11/2017. Discovery due by 3/12/2017. Dispositive Motions filed by 9/7/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Jury Trial set for 2/12/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Ins. Co. v. Whirlpool Corp., et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven H. Yuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Represented By: Georges Andrew Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Georges Andrew Haddad
Represented By: Bruce G. Nye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?