Alder v. County of Yolo
Plaintiff: Evan Alder
Defendant: County of Yolo
Case Number: 2:2016cv01682
Filed: July 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Yolo
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE signed by District Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/31/2018. (Zignago, K.)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by District Judge Vince Chhabria on 3/20/18 GRANTING IN PART 29 Motion for approval of settlement agreement. (Kaminski, H)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by District Judge Vince Chhabria on 1/22/2018 DENYING plaintiffs' 26 motion for approval of settlement. Plaintiffs may file a new motion addressing the above issues within 30 days. A telephonic case management conference is set for 3/13/2018 at 02:30 PM before District Judge Vince Chhabria. (Zignago, K.)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by District Judge Vince Chhabria on 11/20/2017 VACATING the previously scheduled dates for the pretrial conference and trial. Plaintiff's counsel is ORDERED to file a motion for Settlement Approval by 12/4/2017. (Donati, J)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Vince Chhabria on 09/01/17 ORDERING that the Expert Disclosure deadline is EXTENDED to 10/30/17 and the Expert Discovery Cutoff is EXTENDED to 11/17/17. (Benson, A.)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Vince Chhabria on 11/9/2016 ORDERING that the Parties file a Case Management Conference with the Court on or before 12/13/2016, and that the Initial Case Management Conference is set for 12/20/2016. (Zignago, K.)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by District Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/22/2016 ORDERING the parties to refer to the standing orders of Judge Chhabria. It is FURTHER ORDERED that all hearing dates presently scheduled are VACATED and must be RESCHEDULED consistent with this order and the applicable rules. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alder v. County of Yolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evan Alder
Represented By: Jason H Jasmine
Represented By: Gary Marc Messing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Yolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?