Van Tilburg v. Seibel
Petitioner: Clifford John Van Tilburg
Respondent: Kimberly A. Seibel
Case Number: 2:2016cv01688
Filed: July 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Riverside
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM DECISION signed by Senior Judge James K. Singleton on 6/28/2017 DENYING 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. It is further ORDERED that the Court DECLINES to issue a Certificate of Appealability. CASE CLOSED. (Donati, J)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/31/17 GRANTING 16 Motion for Extension of time; petitioner has 30 days from the date this order is served to file his traverse.(Dillon, M)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/30/16 GRANTING 14 Motion for Extension of time. Petitioner has 30 days from the date this order is served to file his traverse.(Dillon, M)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/25/16 ORDERING that petitioner shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis or the appropriate filing fee; petitioners failure to comply with this order may result in this action being dismissed; and Clerk of the Court is directed to send petitioner a copy of the in forma pauperis form used by this district.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Tilburg v. Seibel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clifford John Van Tilburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kimberly A. Seibel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?