Deere v. CDC Medical Staff, et al.
Petitioner: Arthur Ray Deere, Sr.
Respondent: CDC Medical Staff and CDC Medical Policy Making Staff for Treatment
Case Number: 2:2016cv01695
Filed: July 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/25/19 DISMISSING this action. CASE CLOSED. (Coll, A)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER ADOPTING 40 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 06/10/19. Plaintiff's 38 "Motion to Reinstate IFP Status and Continue Civil Action" (construed as both a Rule 60(b) motion for re lief from judgment and an opposition to defendants' 33 Motion to Revoke Plaintiffs IFP Status) is GRANTED as to the Rule 60(b) Motion; GRANTING defendants' 33 Motion to Revoke plaintiff's IFP status to the extent that plaintiff's IFP status is REVOKED and plaintiff is required to pay the $400 filing fee within 14 days. Plaintiff is warned that failure to do so will result in the dismissal of this action (cc: Financial). CASE REOPENED (Benson, A.)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 02/19/19 ORDERING the Clerk of the Court randomly assign a United States District Judge to this action. Also, RECOMMENDING that plaintiffs Motion to Reinstate IFP Status and Continue Civil Action, 38 be construed as both a motion for relief from judgment pursuant to Rule 60(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and an opposition to defendants Motion to Revoke Plaintiffs In Forma Pauperis Status 33 . Plaintiffs Rule 60(b) motion 38 be granted. Defendants Motion to Revoke Plaintiffs In Forma Pauperis Status 33 be granted to the extent that plaintiffs in forma pauperis status be revoked and plaintiff be required to pay the $400 filing fee within fourteen days from the date of any order adopting these findings and recommendations and be warned that failure to do so willresult in the dismissal of this action. Motions 33 and 38 referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/29/2018 ORDERING, within 21 days, plaintiff shall file either an opposition to the motion or a statement of no opposition. (Yin, K)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/25/2017 GRANTING 24 Request. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this order is served to file his amended complaint. (Hunt, G)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/4/2017 DISMISSING 21 First Amended Complaint with leave to amend within 30 days. (Henshaw, R)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/6/17 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of Arthur Ray Deere, Sr. and forward payment to the court until the bal ance is paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial)(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deere v. CDC Medical Staff, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arthur Ray Deere, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CDC Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CDC Medical Policy Making Staff for Treatment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?