Ahmed v. Beverly Health and Rehabilitation Services, Inc., et al.

Plaintiff: Henna Ahmed
Defendant: Beverly Health and Rehabilitation Services, Inc. and GGNSC Administrative Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv01747
Filed: July 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE: MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES, COSTS, AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVE SERVICE PAYMENT signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/24/18. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that plaintiff's Motions for final certification, final approval of class action settlement, attorneys' fees, costs, and incentive award (Docket Nos. 44 , 45 ) are, GRANTED. CASE CLOSED (Becknal, R)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION and ORDER Granting Approval of and Leave to Issue Notice of Errata to Class Members 42 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/8/2018. (Kirksey Smith, K)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/9/2018 RESETTING the Hearing for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement to 4/30/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Hunt, G)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/6/2018 GRANTING 34 Plaintiff's Motion for preliminary certification of a conditional settlement class and preliminary approval of the class action settlement; Defendant and the claims administrator shall notify class members of the settlement in the manner specified in the settlement agreement; the parties agree that Atticus Administration, LLC will serve as the settlement administrator; the court also approves declared fee s and costs of administering the settlement of up to $16,000; All discovery and pretrial proceedings and deadlines are stayed and suspended until further notice from the court, except for such actions as are necessary to implement the settlement agreement and this Order; the final Approval Hearing is set for 5/14/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; to determine whether the settlement agreement should be finally approved as fair, reasonable, and adequate; the court will also consider plaintiff's motion for attorneys' fees, costs, and service payment; Plaintiff shall file a motion for attorneys' fees no later than 35 calendar days after the mailing of the class notice. (Reader, L)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION and ORDER for continuance 36 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/18/2017: Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and Provisional Certification of the Class 34 is reset for 2/5/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The 2/12/2018 pre-trial conference and the 3/13/2018 trial dates are vacated. (Kirksey Smith, K)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/7/2017 ORDERING plaintiff's deadline for filing her motion for class certification is EXTENDED to 11/30/2017. (Zignago, K.)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/2/2017 ORDERING that plaintiff's deadline for filing motion for class certification is EXTENDED to 10/27/2017. (Zignago, K.)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/11/17, ORDERING that the deadline for class discovery is EXTENDED to 7/31/2017, and Plaintiff's deadline for filing her motion for class certification is EXTENDED to 8/28/2017. (Kastilahn, A)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/11/2017. (Washington, S)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/30/16. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 1/16/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Jury Trial is set for 3/13/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kastilahn, A)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/10/16: Plaintiff shall have leave to file her First Amended Class Action and Individual Complaint. Defendants shall have twenty-one (21) days after service of the filed First Amended Class Action and Individual Complaint within which to answer or otherwise plead in response thereto. (Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahmed v. Beverly Health and Rehabilitation Services, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henna Ahmed
Represented By: Robert Joshua Wasserman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Health and Rehabilitation Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGNSC Administrative Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?