Carroll v. State of California et al
Plaintiff: Tremayne Deon Carroll
Defendant: State of California and CDCR
Case Number: 2:2016cv01759
Filed: July 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/29/18 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/18/2018 VACATING the 49 findings and recommendations filed 4/4/2018. Plaintiff has 30 days to file a second amended complaint. No extensions of time will be granted. The Clerk shall send plaintiff the form for a civil rights complaint. Plaintiff's 50 motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED.(Yin, K)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/4/2018 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/22/2018 DENYING without prejudice 47 Motion for Leave to Amend. Plaintiff granted 30 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint. (Henshaw, R)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/8/2018 GRANTING 44 and 45 Requests for Relief From Judgment, DENYING 11 , 21 and 35 Request for Reconsideration. To the extent Plaintiff is separately requesting appointment counsel again (rather than reconsideration of the earlier denials), that request is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to amend court records to reflect the address for Plaintiff contained in his August 24, 2017 pleading. CASE REOPENED. (Hunt, G)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/1/2017 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/22/2017 ORDERING that the findings and recommendations filed 3/24/2017, are ADOPTED in full; and Plaintiff's motions for injunctive relief filed 12/19/2016, and 3/15/2017 (ECF Nos. 25 , 33 ) are DENIED. (Becknal, R)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/18/17 ordering plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint on the form provided by the court. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff the form for a civil rights complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983. (Plummer, M)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/24/2017 RECOMMENDING plaintiff's 25 , 33 motions for injunctive relief be denied. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/27/17 GRANTING 30 Motion for Extension of time. Plaintiff is granted 45 days from the date of this order in which to file an amended complaint. No further extensions of time will be granted.(Dillon, M)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/10/2017 ORDERING that, upon reconsideration, the order of the Magistrate Judge filed 12/9/2016, ECF No. 21 , is AFFIRMED. (Reader, L)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/9/2016 ORDERING Plaintiff's amended complaint is DISMISSED with 30 days to file a second amended complaint; failure to file a second amended complaint within that time will result in a recommendation of dismissal of this action; Plaintiff's 19 motion for injunctive relief and motion for appointment of counsel are DENIED. (Reader, L)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/14/16 DENYING 16 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/31/16 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of Tremayne Deon Carroll and forward payment to the court until the ba lance is paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial)(Dillon, M)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/12/16 ORDERING that the September 21, 2016 findings and recommendations (ECF No. 8 ) are VACATED; Plaintiff's motion for extension of time (ECF No. 9 ) is GRANTED; plaintiff is grant ed 30 days from the date of this order to file his application to proceed in forma pauperis; failure to file this application within that time will result in recommendation of dismissal of this action; Plaintiff's motions for appointment of counsel (ECF Nos. 3 , 9 ) are DENIED.(Dillon, M)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/21/2016 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/11/16 ORDERING that plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a completed affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by t he Clerk of Court; Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner; and plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a certified copy of his prison trust account statement for the six month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carroll v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tremayne Deon Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?