Floyd v. Fox
Petitioner: James Floyd
Respondent: Foxx
Case Number: 2:2016cv01778
Filed: July 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/17/19 ORDERING that within 14 days from the date of this order, respondent may file a sur-reply to petitioner's supplement 42 . (Plummer, M)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/7/2017 ORDERING respondent's 14 motion to dismiss is PARTIALLY GRANTED; Petitioner's grounds three and four are unexhausted, and STRICKEN from the petition; petitioner's 25 motion for stay and abeyance is GRANTED; this action is STAYED pending exhaustion of petitioner's ground two in the California state courts; Petitioner shall file a motion to lift the stay of this action within 30 days from the date the Califor nia Supreme Court issues an order addressing petitioner's habeas petition; the Clerk shall change respondent's last name to "Fox", and shall administratively close this case; and the undersigned DECLINES to issue a certificate of appealability under 28 U.S.C. § 2253. (Yin, K)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/10/17 ordering that Charles M. Bonneau, Jr. is substituted in as appointed counsel for petitioner James Floyd in place of the Office of the Federal Defender for the Eastern District of California 20 . (Plummer, M)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/24/2017 GRANTING petitioner's 18 motion for appointment of counsel. The order to show cause 17 is DISCHARGED. The Federal Defender is APPOINTED to represent petitioner. The Clerk shal l serve a copy of this order on the Federal Defender, Attention: Habeas Appointment. Petitioner's counsel shall contact the Clerk's office to make arrangements for copies of documents in the file. Within 60 days, petitioner's counsel shall respond to the pending 14 motion to disiss. (cc: FD, Habeas Appointment)(Yin, K)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/10/17 ORDERING that petitioner show cause, within 30 days, why his failure to oppose respondent's motion to dismiss (ECF No. 14 ) should not be deemed a waiver of any opposition to the granting of the motion, and he shall file an opposition.(Dillon, M)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/6/2016 DENYING without prejudice petitioner's 8 motion for appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Floyd v. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Foxx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?