Trulite Glass and Aluminum Solutions, LLC v. Smith, et al.
Plaintiff: |
Trulite Glass and Aluminum Solutions, LLC |
Defendant: |
Geoff Smith, Tyrone Yount, Nathan Witkin, Bryan McNabb, Patrick J. Shasby, Jr. and California Glass & Mirror Corp. |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv01798 |
Filed: |
July 29, 2016 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Yuba |
Presiding Judge: |
Allison Claire |
Presiding Judge: |
John A. Mendez |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 7, 2017 |
Filing
71
AGREED FINAL INJUNCTION ORDER re Defendants Nathan Witkin, Bryan McNabb signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/6/2017 ORDERING the parties to file, within three (3) days, a Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice of all claims, with each party to bear its own costs. (Michel, G.)
|
November 30, 2016 |
Filing
69
STATUS (Pre-trial Scheduling) ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/30/16: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 3/17/2017. Discovery due by 6/30/2017. Dispositive Motions filed by 8/22/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/3/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. Jury Trial set for 12/11/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Kaminski, H)
|
October 6, 2016 |
Filing
65
AGREED FINAL INJUNCTION ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/4/2016 ORDERING that Trulite has alleged that the Cal Glass Defendants have misappropriated trade secrets of Trulite; by agreeing to the entry of this Apreed Final Injunction Order, the Cal Glass Defendants are verifying that within 10 days from the entry of this Order, each of the Cal Glass Defendants will return to Trulite all hard copies of Trulite information and documents; within 5 days of Trulite receiving the Cal Glass Defendants' written certification and the Expert's verification that the Cal Glass Defendants' destroyed all Trulite information on their electronic devices and in their e-mail and electronic storage accounts, the parties shall f ile a Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice of all claims, counterclaims, third-party claims and causes of action Trulite filed against the Cal Glass Defendants and the Cal Glass Defendants filed against Trulite and Counter-Defendant Trulite WSG, LLC each party to bear its own costs; the Court shall retain jurisdiction over the parties to enforce the requirements of this Order. (Reader, L)
|
August 24, 2016 |
Filing
44
PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/23/16. (Becknal, R)
|
August 19, 2016 |
Filing
37
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/19/16 ORDERING that the defendants are to submit, by noon on Monday, August 22, 2016, their alternative proposed Protective Order. A Word version of the document submitted shall also be provi ded to the courtroom deputy, Valerie Callen, by email; Upon receipt of the ordered document the court will take the matter under submission and a Protective Order will issue prior to August 29, 2016; All parties are reminded that proposed orders must be both electronically filed and submitted in Word format to acorders@caed.uscourts.gov.(Becknal, R)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?