Metro Unlimited Wireless, Inc. v. AmGUARD Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Metro Unlimited Wireless, Inc.
Defendant: AmGUARD Insurance Company and WestGUARD Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv01799
Filed: August 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by District Judge Vince Chhabria on 10/3/17 ORDERING that A settlement agreement has been reached for full resolution of this action with regard to Metros claims against AmGUARD; The terms of said settlement agreement have been satisfied; The parties desire that the entire action be dismissed, with prejudice, with Metro and AmGUARD each bearing their own costs and fees. (Becknal, R)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF DISMISSAL signed by District Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/3/17, ORDERING that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. The parties retain the right to reopen this action within 60 days of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. If a request to reinstate the case is not filed and served on opposing counsel within 60 days, the dismissal will be with prejudice. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by District Judge Vince Chhabria on 07/18/17 ORDERING that, pursuant to 19 Stipulation, the Court's Trial Management Schedule beAMENDED as follows: Fact Discovery Cut-off is extended 09/01/17; Last Day to Hear Dispositive Motions is extended 09/28/17. All other previously established dates are to remain the same. (Benson, A)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by District Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/1/17 ORDERING that the entire action is DISMISSED with prejudice, as to Defendant WestGUARD Insurance Company ONLY, with Metro and WestGUARD to each bear their own costs. (Kastilahn, A)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by District Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/22/2016 ORDERING the parties to refer to the standing orders of Judge Chhabria. It is FURTHER ORDERED that all hearing dates presently scheduled are VACATED and must be RESCHEDULED consistent with this order and the applicable rules. (Reader, L)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by District Judge Vince G Chhabria on 10/19/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Complaint is deemed served upon Defendants AmGUARD Insurance Company and WestGUARD Insurance Company as of 10/3/16. The deadline for Defendants AmGUARD Insurance Company and WestGUARD Insurance Company to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is 11/1/2016. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metro Unlimited Wireless, Inc. v. AmGUARD Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metro Unlimited Wireless, Inc.
Represented By: William J Brown, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmGUARD Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WestGUARD Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?