Gresham, et al v. Picker, et al
Plaintiff: Victor Gresham and Conquest Communications Group, LLC
Defendant: Michael Picker, Mike Florio, Carla Peterman, Liane Randolph and Catherine Sandoval
Case Number: 2:2016cv01848
Filed: August 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/15/2018 APPROVING 40 Stipulation and DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (York, M)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/11/2017 ORDERING the parties, by and through their respective undersigned counsel, respectfully request that the Court MAINTAIN the STAY of all District Court proceedings in this matter pending the U.S. Supreme Court's determination on the petition for writ of certiorari, whether by denial of the petition or, if the petition is granted, by review of the Ninth Circuit's decision. (Reader, L)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/28/16 ORDERING that this matter is STAYED pending decision on the appeal. CASE STAYED (Benson, A)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/06/16 ORDERING that plaintiff's 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. (Benson, A)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/23/16 ORDERING The Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) conference and Joint Status Report ordered by this Court on 8/5/16 shall be postponed until 21 days after the Court issues its ruling on Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction. (Washington, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gresham, et al v. Picker, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Gresham
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Represented By: Stephen M. Duvernay
Represented By: Jason Torchinsky, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conquest Communications Group, LLC
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Represented By: Stephen M. Duvernay
Represented By: Jason Torchinsky, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Picker
Represented By: Arocles Aguilar
Represented By: Christine Jun Hammond
Represented By: Harvey Y. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Florio
Represented By: Arocles Aguilar
Represented By: Christine Jun Hammond
Represented By: Harvey Y. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Peterman
Represented By: Arocles Aguilar
Represented By: Christine Jun Hammond
Represented By: Harvey Y. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liane Randolph
Represented By: Arocles Aguilar
Represented By: Christine Jun Hammond
Represented By: Harvey Y. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Sandoval
Represented By: Arocles Aguilar
Represented By: Christine Jun Hammond
Represented By: Harvey Y. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?