Mikesell v. Commisioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Shelly Monique Mikesell
Defendant: Commisioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv01850
Filed: August 5, 2016
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Tehama
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2018 25 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/2/2018 RECOMMENDING that Plaintiff's 14 motion for summary judgment be denied. Defendant's 19 cross-motion for summary judgment be granted. The Clerk of the Court be directed to enter judgment and close this file. Motions referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Zignago, K.)
April 27, 2018 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/26/2018 DIRECTING Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing, within 10 days of the date of this order, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to inform the court regarding consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, as required by the court's scheduling order. Submission of a completed consent election form shall constitute a sufficient response. (York, M)
November 8, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 11/8/17 ORDERING that the time for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED to 12/13/2017. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 11, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/10/2017 GRANTING an Extension of Time for Defendant to respond to Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment until 11/6/2017. (Hunt, G)
January 24, 2017 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/24/2017 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to serve the 5 Scheduling Order in Social Security Cases; ORDERING the plaintiff to submit to the U.S. Marshal within 1 5 days, a completed 4 Summons and copies of the 1 Social Security Complaint and to file a statement with the court attesting to such service; DIRECTING the U.S. Marshal to serve all process without prepayment of costs within 60 days. (cc: U.S. Marshal) (Michel, G.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mikesell v. Commisioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelly Monique Mikesell
Represented By: Robert Weems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commisioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?