Callahan v. Pinnacle Property Management Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brenna Callahan
Defendant: Pinnacle Property Management Services, LLC and Pinnacle Property Management Services Pier 70
Case Number: 2:2016cv01862
Filed: August 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 04/25/17 ORDERING that this action is DISMISSED in its entirety, with prejudice. Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/5/2017 VACATING the dates and deadlines enumerated in the 5 Pretrial Scheduling Order; ORDERING the parties to provide the Court with a Joint Status Report addressing the outcome of VDRP within 14 days of its conclusion. (Michel, G.)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/21/16 ORDERING that the Parties have until 12/16/16 to file a discovery plan.(Washington, S)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/12/2016 ORDERING Plaintiff's 6 Motion to Remand, previously scheduled to be heard on 9/22/2016, will be removed from calendar. (Jackson, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Callahan v. Pinnacle Property Management Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenna Callahan
Represented By: Justin Paul Rodriguez
Represented By: Erika Ramona Sembrano
Represented By: Galen T. Shimoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Property Management Services, LLC
Represented By: Johnny Alexander Colon
Represented By: James Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Property Management Services Pier 70
Represented By: Johnny Alexander Colon
Represented By: James Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?