Mitchener v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Richard Mitchener
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv01885
Filed: August 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Placer
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/25/2018 GRANTING the parties through their undersigned counsel, that Richard Mitchener be awarded attorney fees in the amount of $3,900.00 under the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28:2412(d). This amount represents compensation for all legal services rendered on behalf of Plaintiff by counsel in connection with this civil action, in accordance with 28:1920; 2412(d). (Reader, L)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/22/2018 GRANTING 17 Motion for Summary Judgment, DENYING 21 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, and REMANDING Case for further proceedings consistent with this order. CASE CLOSED. (York, M)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/19/17 ORDERING that the Defendant has until May 24, 2017, to submit her response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. All other dates in the Scheduling Order shall be extended accordingly. (Becknal, R)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/23/2017 ORDERING Plaintiff shall have an EXTENSION of time to file Motion For Summary Judgment and/or Remand to and include 3/20/2017; and that all other deadlines set forth in the 8/16/2016 Case Management Order shall be EXTENDED accordingly.(Washington, S)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 08/16/16 ORDERING that the 3 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED; Clerk to serve scheduling order; within 14 days, plaintiff shall submit service documents to the USM and file a statement to the court regarding the submission; USM shall serve process within 60 days. (Benson, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchener v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Mitchener
Represented By: Laura Eve Krank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?