Bombaci v. Boim
Plaintiff: Robert Richard Bombaci
Defendant: M. Boim
Case Number: 2:2016cv01906
Filed: August 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/17/2017 ORDERING the case SETTLED. ORDERING that dispositional documents are to be filed not later than 9/15/2017. (Washington, S)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/31/2017 ORDERING Discovery closed; ORDERING Law and Motion closed; and SCHEDULING Settlement Conference for 8/10/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. Parties to submit confidential settlement statements to chambers 7 days prior to the settlement conference. (cc: Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan) (Henshaw, R)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/15/17 ORDERING that the discovery date cut off in this matter is extended to March 17, 2017, so plaintiff can take the deposition of the defendant in this matter.(Dillon, M)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/13/17 ORDERING that the discovery date cut off in this matter is extended to February 17, 2017, so plaintiff can take the deposition of the defendant in this matter.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bombaci v. Boim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Richard Bombaci
Represented By: Julia Mary Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Boim
Represented By: R. Lawrence Bragg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?