Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Vernon Ray Smith
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv01938
Filed: August 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 09/26/17 DENYING plaintiff's 16 Motion for Summary Judgment and GRANTING the Commissioner's 18 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A.)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/9/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff's time to file a motion for summary judgment is EXTENDED to 2/6/2017. (Kastilahn, A)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/22/2016 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 3 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve scheduling order in social security cases. Within fourteen days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the United States Marshal a completed summons and copies of the complaint and to file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the United States Marshal. The United States Marshal is directed to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than sixty days from the date o this order. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernon Ray Smith
Represented By: Peter Brixie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Donna Wade Anderson
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?