Scott v. Sherman
Petitioner: Thomas Charles Scott
Respondent: Steward Sherman
Case Number: 2:2016cv01957
Filed: August 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/7/19 ADOPTING in full 27 Findings and Recommendations and DENYING the petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus. The court DECLINES to issue the certificate of appealability and DENIES petitioner's 33 motion to appoint counsel. CASE CLOSED(Kastilahn, A)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/1/2019 RECOMMENDING 1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus be denied. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/3/2017 DENYING 23 Motion to Appoint Counsel without prejudice to a renewal of the motion at a later stage of the proceeding. (Washington, S)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 08/24/16. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas Charles Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steward Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?