Wright v. Macomber et al
Plaintiff: Dominic Va'shon Wright
Defendant: Jeff Macomber, L. Eldridge, M. Hontz and D. Roth
Case Number: 2:2016cv02054
Filed: August 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/14/2019 DENYING 55 Motion for Appointment of Counsel and RECOMMENDING 45 Motion for Summary Judgment be granted. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 04/30/19 ORDERING that, within 30 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an opposition, if any, to the motion for summary judgment. (Plummer, M)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 03/13/19 GRANTING 46 Motion for Protective Order. Discovery is stayed pending resolution of defendants summary judgment motion. Defendants motion for an extension of time 47 is granted; defe ndants responses to plaintiffs pending discovery requests are due within 45 days of the court order resolving defendants summary judgment motion, if appropriate. Plaintiffs motion to continue or deny defendants summary judgment motion 48 is denied; plaintiffs opposition to defendants summary judgment motion is due within thirty days of the date of this order. Plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel 49 is denied. Defendants motion to modify the scheduling order 52 is granted; the December 28, 2018 discovery deadline and the March 22, 2019 deadline for filing dispositive motions are vacated; these dates will be reset following resolution of defendants summary judgment motion, if appropriate.(Plummer, M)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/10/2018 REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 120 DAYS. The parties shall file the attached notice re settlement conference within 30 days of this order. The assig ned DAG shall contact Courtroom Deputy within 30 days to schedule a settlement conference. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the conference. If settlement is reached, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement. The Clerk shall serve copies of (a) plaintiff's complaint, (b) the screening order, and (c) the instant order, on Supervising DAG Christopher Becker. (cc: Christopher Becker) (Henshaw, R)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/5/2018 ADOPTING 26 findings and recommendations in full. All claims in the third amended complaint are DISMISSED, but for the Eighth Amendment and retaliation claims against defendants Macomber and Roth, and the retaliation claim against defendant Masterson based on his alleged filing of the false disciplinary report. (Zignago, K.)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/5/2018 RECOMMENDING all claims in the 23 third amended complaint be dismissed, but for the Eighth Amendment and retaliation claims against defendants Macomber and Roth, and the retaliation claim against defendant Masterson based on his alleged filing of the false disciplinary report. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/31/2018 VACATING the 22 order and 21 findings and recommendations filed 1/23/2018. A separate order screening the third amended complaint will issue.(Yin, K)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/23/18 RECOMMENDING that all claims in the second amended complaint, but for the 8th Amendment claims against defendants Roth and Macomber be dismissed. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/1/2017 ORDERING, within 30 days, plaintiff may file a third amended complaint. If plaintiff does not file a third amended complaint, the court will order service of defendants Macomber and Roth as to plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claim.(Yin, K)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/24/2017 DISMISSING plaintiff's amended complaint with leave to file a second amended complaint within 30 days.(Yin, K)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Dominic Va'shon Wright signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/8/2016. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments an d forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the SACRAMENTO Division of the Eastern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/26/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Macomber et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominic Va'shon Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Macomber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Eldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Hontz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?