Brooke v. Capitol Regency LLC
Plaintiff: Theresa Brooke
Defendant: Capitol Regency LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv02070
Filed: August 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/17/2017 GRANTING 19 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice; GRANTING the plaintiff twenty (20) days to file an amended complaint; ORDERING the defendant to file a responsive pleading to said complaint twenty (20) days thereafter; CAUTIONING the plaintiff that the Clerk of Court will be directed to close this case in the absence of an amended complaint; ORDERING counsel for the defendant to pay $200.00 to the Clerk of Court within five days. (cc: Financial Department) (Michel, G.)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/9/17: The referral of this case to the magistrate judge is withdrawn and the case is referred back to the district judge. March 1, 2017 hearing on defendant's motion to dismiss is vacated.(Kaminski, H)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/12/2016 ORDERING that the 9 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel is GRANTED. Attorney Peter Kristofer Strojnik and The Strojnik Firm LLC are WITHDRAWN as counsel of record for Plaintiff, and Plaintiff shall represent herself. The hearing currently set for 1/10/2017 is CONTINUED to 2/7/2017, if Plaintiff retains a new attorney. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooke v. Capitol Regency LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Brooke
Represented By: Peter Kristofer Strojnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capitol Regency LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?