Coulter v James et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Coulter
Defendant: Deborah Lee James, The Department of the Air Force and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2016cv02076
Filed: August 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by District Judge Stanley A Bastian on 8/15/17: Plaintiff's Whistleblower Protection Act claim and Federal Tort Act claim for Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress are DISMISSED, for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter this Order, forward copies to counsel, and close the files. (Kaminski, H)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by District Judge Stanley A Bastian on 6/22/17 ORDERING that Defendants' MOTION to DISMISS 18 is GRANTED, in part. On or before 7/5/2017, Plaintiff shall file additional briefing addressing the request for a stay and the Mangano d ecision. On or before 7/15/2017, Defendants shall file its responsive briefing. On or before 7/26/2017, Plaintiff shall file any reply. IT IS SO ORDERED. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter this Order and forward copies to counsel. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Stanley A Bastian on 03/29/17 ORDERING that parties' Stipulation withdrawing U.S's 8 Motion to Dismiss, permitting filing of Amended Complaint and setting responsive deadline is GRANTED; defe ndant's 8 Motion to Dismiss is WITHDRAWN and any related dates are VACATED; plaintiff is GRANTED LEAVE to file 12 First Amended Complaint; any responsive pleading is due 04/20/17; a Joint Status Report is due 7 days after any answer is filed. (Benson, A)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by District Judge Stanley A Bastian on 03/01/17 ORDERING that, pursuant to the parties' 10 Stipulation, the hearing on the 8 Motion to Dismiss is CONTINUED to 04/13/17 without oral argument. Any opposition and reply are due in accordance with the Local Rules; the due date for the Joint Status Report is continued until 7 days after any Answer is filed in this action. (Benson, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coulter v James et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Coulter
Represented By: Waukeen Q. McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Lee James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Department of the Air Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?