Rutherford v. Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Plaintiff: Rutherford and Amanda Rutherford
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Case Number: 2:2016cv02100
Filed: September 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/31/2017 DISMISSING this action, with prejudice; ORDERING each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G.)
May 30, 2017 Filing 17 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL of action, with prejudice, pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); PROPOSED ORDER by Amanda Rutherford. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Uzeta, Michelle)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/4/2017 ORDERING the Parties file a Stipulation of Dismissal within sixty (60) days of the date this order is electronically filed; All currently set dates be taken off calendar. (Becknal, R)
May 4, 2017 Filing 15 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by Amanda Rutherford. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Uzeta, Michelle)
April 19, 2017 Filing 14 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Amanda Rutherford. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Uzeta, Michelle)
December 29, 2016 Filing 13 ANSWER by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. Attorney Charalambides, Megha J. added.(Charalambides, Megha)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FOURTH STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/7/2016 ORDERING that Kaiser may have a 21-day EXTENSION of time in which to respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Pursuant to this extension, a response by Kaiser shall be due on or before 12/29/2016. (Jackson, T)
December 2, 2016 Filing 11 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint re #1 Complaint, by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Launey, Kristina)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/26/2016 ORDERING that a response by Kaiser shall be due on or before 12/8/2016. (Zignago, K.)
November 16, 2016 Filing 9 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint, by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Launey, Kristina)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 11/2/16 ORDERING that Kaiser shall respond to the Complaint on or before 11/17/2016. (Kastilahn, A)
October 24, 2016 Filing 7 SECOND STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER Extending Time to Respond to #1 Complaint, by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Launey, Kristina) Modified on 10/25/2016 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
October 2, 2016 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals served on 9/8/2016, answer due 9/29/2016. (Potter, Mark)
September 28, 2016 Filing 5 STATEMENT of Corporate Disclosure by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Launey, Kristina)
September 28, 2016 Filing 4 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, for Extension of Time for Defendant Kaiser Foundation Hospitals to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief by Not More Than 28 Days (L.R. 144(A)) by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. Attorney Launey, Kristina Marie added. (Launey, Kristina)
September 2, 2016 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Washington, S)
September 2, 2016 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Kaiser Foundation Hospitals* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michelle Uzeta* *710 S. Myrtle Ave., #306* *Monrovia, CA 91016*. (Washington, S)
September 2, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Kaiser Foundation Hospitals by Amanda Rutherford. Attorney Uzeta, Michelle added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-6650333) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Uzeta, Michelle) Modified on 9/2/2016 (Washington, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rutherford v. Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Rutherford
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Maria Michelle Uzeta
Represented By: Mark D. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Represented By: Kristina Marie Launey
Represented By: Megha J. Charalambides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?