Adkins v. Brink's In.
Plaintiff: William Adkins
Defendant: Brink's Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv02115
Filed: September 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by William H Orrick, III on 9/5/17: The court retains jurisdiction for forty-five days to enforce the parties' settlement terms. (Kaminski, H)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by William H Orrick, III on 8/17/17 ORDERING that the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's 25 motion for approval of the settlement. The parties may file a stipulation for dismissal after this order is signed. (Kastilahn, A)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by William H Orrick, III on 07/18/17 ORDERING that the hearing on the 25 Motion for Disbursement of Funds is RESET to 9/13/2017 at 02:00 PM telephonically before William H. Orrick III. (Benson, A)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by William H Orrick, III on 5/11/2017 ORDERING the parties have notified the Court that they have reached a settlement in this case and will shortly be moving for preliminary approval. Dkt. No. 22 . Therefore, the 5/17/2017 settlement conference is VACATED. The 5/30/2017 Case Management Conference remains on calendar.(Becknal, R)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge William H Orrick, III on 3/3/17: Case Management Conference in this action is continued to May 30, 2017 at 3 p.m. A further Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed on or before May 23, 2017. (Kaminski, H)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by William H Orrick, III on 2/10/2017 RANDOMLY REFERRING this case for settlement to Magistrate Judge Barnes. Parties to contact Judge Barnes' chambers to schedule the conference. (cc Judge Barnes) (Donati, J)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by William H Orrick, III on 1/18/17, REFERRING this case to the Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program (VDRP). (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adkins v. Brink's In.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Adkins
Represented By: Adam Morris Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brink's Inc.
Represented By: Becki D. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?