Moore v. Fontecha et al
Plaintiff: Jamario Moore
Defendant: Catherine Fontecha, San Joaquin General Hospital and C. Smith
Case Number: 2:2016cv02138
Filed: September 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/14/2018 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 25 are ADOPTED in FULL; and all Defendants other than Dr. C. Smith are DISMISSED. (Reader, L)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/31/2018 ORDERING Clerk of Court to assign a district court judge to this case; DIRECTING Plaintiff to submit service documents and USM-285 Forms; and RECOMMENDI NG all defendants other than defendant Dr. C. Smith be dismissed. Service is appropriate for C. Smith. Clerk to send plaintiff: 1 Summons, 1 USM-285 Form with instruction sheet, and 1 copy of the Amended Complaint filed on 10/16/2017. Within 30 days form the date of this order, Plaintiff to complete and submit service documents with Notice of Submission of Documents. Assigned and referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/28/2017 GRANTING 22 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff granted up to and including 10/21/2017 in which to file an amended complaint. (Henshaw, R)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/6/2017 DISMISSING 1 complaint. Plaintiff to file an amended complaint within 30 days from the date of service of this order. (Henshaw, R)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying 15 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/18/17. (Plummer, M)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Jamario Moore signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/5/2016. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/25/2016 DISMISSING this action without prejudice and the Clerk shall close this case. CASE CLOSED. (Yin, K)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/12/2016 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp or the $400.00 required fees. The Clerk shall send plaintiff a new ifp application.(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Fontecha et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamario Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Fontecha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Joaquin General Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?