Vang et al v. Lopey, et al.,
Plaintiff: Jesse Vang, Wang Chang, Joua Chao Moua, Alexander Vang, Dang Xiong, Dollarsai Yurgh, Joua Yeng Vang, Manisy Moua, Poua Vang and Richard Vang
Defendant: Jon Lopey, Colleen Setzer, Alex Nishimura, County of Siskiyou and California Department of Forestry
Case Number: 2:2016cv02172
Filed: September 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/7/2017 DENYING 79 Motion for Attorney Fees. (Zignago, K.)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/1/2017 GRANTING 72 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. The Court has DISMISSED with prejudice all Plaintiffs' claims against all defendants and therefore DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to close the case. CASE CLOSED (Washington, S)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/3/2017 GRANTING 58 Motion to Dismiss. California Department of Forestry and Fire Protection and Alex Nishimura are DISMISSED as defendants in this case. (Zignago, K.)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/27/17 ORDERING that the County's 59 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. The first, third, and fourth claims are dismissed with prejudice. The second claim is dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiffs shall file their Third Amended Complaint within 20 days of this Order. The County shall file its responsive pleading 20 days thereafter. (Kastilahn, A)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/6/2017 ORDERING that the current 4/10/2017 deadline for the parties to file their Joint Status Report with Rule 26 discovery plan is VACATED. The parties are ORDERED to file their Joint Status Report with Rule 26 discovery plan on or before 6/11/2017. (Zignago, K.)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/3/17: The current February 10, 2017 deadline for the parties to file their Joint Status Report with Rule 26 discovery plan is vacated. The parties are ordered to file their Joint Status Report with Rule 26 discovery plan on or before April 10, 2017. (Kaminski, H)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/12/2017 GRANTING 15 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss without leave to amend against Jon Lopey and Colleen Setzer; the first, second, third and eleventh causes of action as brought against the County are DISMISSED with leave to amend; Setzer and Lopey are DISMISSED with prejudice; plaintiffs amended complaint due within 20 days of the date of this Order; the County shall file its responsive pleading 20 days thereafter. (Reader, L)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 01/04/17 ORDERING that Defendant's 16 Special Motion to Strike is DENIED. (Benson, A)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 01/03/17 ORDERING that Defendant California Department of Forestry and Fire Protection's time to respond to the complaint is EXTENDED to 02/06/17. (Benson, A)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/2/16 ORDERING defendant California Department of Forestry and Fire Protection's time to respond to the complaint is extended to 1/7/2017. (Washington, S)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/10/2016 ORDERING the parties to file their Joint Status Report with Rule 26 Discovery Plan by 2/10/2017. (Michel, G.)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/10/2016 FINDING that this action is related to the action denominated 2:16-cv-02238 TLN CMK within the meaning of Local Rule 123; REASSIGNING the action denominated 2:16-cv-02238 TLN CM K to Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison for all further proceedings; VACATING any dates currently set in the reassigned case; ORDERING that the caption on all documents filed henceforth in the reassigned case be shown as 2:16-cv-02238 JAM CMK; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to make the appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vang et al v. Lopey, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Vang
Represented By: Randolph E. Daar
Represented By: Kyndra Sheri Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wang Chang
Represented By: Randolph E. Daar
Represented By: Kyndra Sheri Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joua Chao Moua
Represented By: Randolph E. Daar
Represented By: Kyndra Sheri Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Vang
Represented By: Randolph E. Daar
Represented By: Kyndra Sheri Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dang Xiong
Represented By: Randolph E. Daar
Represented By: Kyndra Sheri Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dollarsai Yurgh
Represented By: Randolph E. Daar
Represented By: Kyndra Sheri Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joua Yeng Vang
Represented By: Randolph E. Daar
Represented By: Kyndra Sheri Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manisy Moua
Represented By: Randolph E. Daar
Represented By: Kyndra Sheri Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Poua Vang
Represented By: Randolph E. Daar
Represented By: Kyndra Sheri Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Vang
Represented By: Randolph E. Daar
Represented By: Kyndra Sheri Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Lopey
Represented By: Domenic D. Spinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen Setzer
Represented By: Domenic D. Spinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Nishimura
Represented By: George Michael Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Siskiyou
Represented By: Domenic D. Spinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Forestry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?