Nygaard v. Property Damage Appraisers, Inc.

Plaintiff: Brian K. Nygaard
Defendant: Property Damage Appraisers, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv02184
Filed: September 13, 2016
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order 48 ORDER signed by District Judge Vince Chhabria on 3/1/2018 REFERRING this case to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte for discovery disputes and all further discovery in this action pursuant to Northern District of California Local Rule 72-1. (Donati, J)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 45 ORDER signed by District Judge Vince Chhabria on 2/13/2018 GRANTING IN PART 35 Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. In light of this order, the 2/15/2018 case management conference and the hearing on PDA's motion are VACATED. (York, M)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order 33 ORDER signed by District Judge Vince Chhabria on 12/28/17 DENYING 27 Motion to Compel Arbitration; a telephonic Case Management Conference is SET for 1/30/2018 at 02:30 PM before District Judge Vince Chhabria; Case Management Statement is due by 01/23/18. (Benson, A.)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order 26 ORDER signed by District Judge Vince Chhabria on 08/09/17 ORDERING that PDA is ordered to refile its 25 Motion in compliance with the page limits set in this Court's 7 Civil Standing Order. The revised motion is due by 08/10/17. Briefing deadlines related to the motion to compel will remain unchanged. (Benson, A.)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/29/2017 ORDERING the parties to appear for mediation on 7/19/2017 in Los Angeles, California before Hon. Rex Hesseman (ret.); SETTING a Telephonic Case Management Conference for 8/15/ 2017 at 02:30 PM before District Judge Vince Chhabria; ORDERING that an updated joint case management statement be submitted by 8/8/2017; ORDERING the plaintiff to provide the Court, and all other parties, a telephone conference line, three days prior to the Case Management Conference, to be used for said conference. (Michel, G.)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order 17 ORDER signed by District Judge Vince Chhabria on 3/23/2017 ORDERING that the request to transfer is DENIED. This case is STAYED pending mediation in accordance with this Order, and a telephonic case management conference is set for 6/27/2017, at 2:30 pm. CASE STAYED. (Zignago, K.)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order 7 ORDER signed by Vince Chhabria on 10/26/2016 ORDERING the parties to refer to the standing orders of Judge Chhabria. It is FURTHER ORDERED that all hearing dates presently scheduled are VACATED and must be RESCHEDULED consistent with this order and the applicable rules. (Michel, G.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nygaard v. Property Damage Appraisers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian K. Nygaard
Represented By: Suzanne Marie Alves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Property Damage Appraisers, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Richard Fickel
Represented By: Christopher David Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?