Welch et al v. Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kelly Welch, Priscilla Macksoud, Jon Wunderlin, Christopher Brixey, David Ledwith, Lisa Gresham, Guillermina Avitia, Claudia Soto, Tammy Sanchez, Randy Giefer, Gerald Lalonde, Diane Holland, Jennie Keen, Gabriel Sucre, John Kenyon, Kurt Johnson, Rosa Trevino, Rhonda Jackson, Matthew Bence, Kishon Montez, Loraine McWhorter, Arturo Castaneda, Rod Couture, Francine Giardino, Blondell Roberston, Kevin Ryerson, Steven Chapman, Rosa Torres, Terrie Walker, Judy Balsavich, Amber Dolan and Michelle Humphreys
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv02202
Filed: September 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by District Judge Vince Chhabria on 10/30/2017 DISMISSING Plaintiff Jon Wunderlin's claims without prejudice. Blumenthal, Nordrehaug & Bhowmik LLP's motion for leave of court to withdraw as counsel of record for Wunderlin is GRANTED. (Hunt, G)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by District Judge Vince Chhabria on 09/25/17 ORDERING that, per Dkt. No. 20, except for Plaintiff Jon Wunderlin, this action is: (1) DISMISSED as to the plaintiffs' individual claims with prejudice; and (2) DISMISSED without prejud ice as to the claims of aggrieved employees. This action is RE-OPENED as to plaintiff Jon Wunderlin. Blumenthal, Nordrehaug & Bhowmik LLP's 22 Motion for leave of court to withdraw as counsel of record for Wunderlin will be heard telephonicall y on 10/26/17 at 10:00 a.m. Mr. Wunderlin is required to appear at the conference via telephone. Plaintiffs' counsel shall provide Mr. Wunderlin notice, the conference line and applicable access code that he is required to appear via email, via telephone, and via first-class mail. (Benson, A.)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Vince Chhabria on 7/19/17: The deadline to move to reopen the case shall be continued by sixty (60) days until October 2, 2017 to allow for additional time to have the settlement agreements signed and a stipulation for dismissal filed as contemplated by the terms of the settlement. (Kaminski, H)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF DISMISSAL signed by District Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/5/17 ORDERING that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. All deadlines and hearings in the case are VACATED. Any pending motions are moot. The parties retain the right to reopen this action within 90 days of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. If a request to reinstate the case is not filed and served on opposing counsel within 90 days, the dismissal will be with prejudice. CASE CLOSED(Becknal, R)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting 6 Stipulation and Proposed Order for Leave to File FAC. Signed by District Judge Vince Chhabria on 11/3/2016. (Law Clerk, VCLC2)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Vince Chhabria on 10/26/16 ORDERING the parties to refer to the standing orders of Judge Chhabria. It is FURTHER ORDERED that all hearing dates presently scheduled are VACATED and must be RESCHEDULED consistent with this order and the applicable rules. (Butolph, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Welch et al v. Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Welch
Represented By: Norman Blumenthal
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Priscilla Macksoud
Represented By: Norman Blumenthal
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Wunderlin
Represented By: Norman Blumenthal
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Brixey
Represented By: Norman Blumenthal
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ledwith
Represented By: Norman Blumenthal
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Gresham
Represented By: Norman Blumenthal
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermina Avitia
Represented By: Norman Blumenthal
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Soto
Represented By: Norman Blumenthal
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Sanchez
Represented By: Norman Blumenthal
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Giefer
Represented By: Norman Blumenthal
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Lalonde
Represented By: Norman Blumenthal
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Holland
Represented By: Norman Blumenthal
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennie Keen
Represented By: Norman Blumenthal
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Sucre
Represented By: Norman Blumenthal
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Kenyon
Represented By: Norman Blumenthal
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt Johnson
Represented By: Norman Blumenthal
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Trevino
Represented By: Norman Blumenthal
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Jackson
Represented By: Norman Blumenthal
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Bence
Represented By: Norman Blumenthal
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kishon Montez
Represented By: Norman Blumenthal
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loraine McWhorter
Represented By: Norman Blumenthal
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Castaneda
Represented By: Norman Blumenthal
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rod Couture
Represented By: Norman Blumenthal
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francine Giardino
Represented By: Norman Blumenthal
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blondell Roberston
Represented By: Norman Blumenthal
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Ryerson
Represented By: Norman Blumenthal
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Chapman
Represented By: Norman Blumenthal
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Torres
Represented By: Norman Blumenthal
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrie Walker
Represented By: Norman Blumenthal
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Balsavich
Represented By: Norman Blumenthal
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Dolan
Represented By: Norman Blumenthal
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Humphreys
Represented By: Norman Blumenthal
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Alice Y. Chu
Represented By: William Jeffrey Goines
Represented By: Robert James Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?