Pellegrini et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Timothy J. Pellegrini and Loribeth B. Pellegrini
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Trustee Corps and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv02214
Filed: September 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 01/27/2017 ORDERING the case REMANDED to the Superior Court of California. Copy of remand order sent to other court. CASE CLOSED. (Jackson, T)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/20/16: The Parties shall confer and prepare and submit to the Court a joint status report, which shall include a Rule 26(f) discovery plan, no later than twenty-one (21) days following the date of this Court's Order on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed on December 20, 2016. (Kaminski, H)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/15/16 ORDERING the Court's Order Requiring Joint Status Report entered on September 19, 2016, is hereby modified as follows: The Parties shall confer (per Fed. R Civ. P 26 (f)) and prepare and submit to the Court a joint status report, which shall include a Rule 26(f) discovery plan, no later than twenty-one (21) days following the date of this Court's Order on Plaintiffs' pending Motion to Remand. (Becknal, R)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/2/16 ORDERING that the time for Trustee Corps to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint is extended to and including 12/20/16, being seven days after the hearing of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand currently set for 12/13/16.(Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pellegrini et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy J. Pellegrini
Represented By: Danny A. Barak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loribeth B. Pellegrini
Represented By: Danny A. Barak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: David M. Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee Corps
Represented By: Richard J. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: David M. Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?