Aranda v. American Pasteurization Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Jose Aranda
Defendant: American Pasteurization Company, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv02242
Filed: September 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/27/2017 ORDERING all parties to disclose expert witnesses by 12/11/2017 and to disclose rebuttal experts by 1/2/2018; ORDERING that expert discovery be completed by 1/19/2018. (Michel, G.)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/24/2017 VACATING 11 Stipulation and Order. (Washington, S)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/21/2017 ORDERING that the expert witness disclosure deadlines are CONTINUED as follows: Initial expert disclosure due 12/22/2017; Rebuttal expert disclosure due 1/22/2018; Expert discovery cut-off is 2/19/2018. (Zignago, K.)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/15/2107 DISMISSING the plaintiff's Fourth and Fifth Causes of Action pursuant to the 8 Stipulation for Dismissal. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aranda v. American Pasteurization Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Aranda
Represented By: Linh T. Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Pasteurization Company, LLC
Represented By: Michelle L. Christian
Represented By: Nick C. Geannacopulos
Represented By: Ari Matthew Hersher
Represented By: Pamela L. Vartabedian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?