Way v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Katie Way, John Way and Eddy Way
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A. and MTC Financial Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv02244
Filed: September 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/28/2019 GRANTED without leave to amend, Motions to Dismiss 60 , and 61 . MTC Financial Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A., and Caliber Home Loans, Inc. are DISMISSED from this action. Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. however, has answered the Second Amended Complaint and therefore remains an active named defendant in this matter.(Reader, L)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/7/18 granting in part and denying in part Motions to Dismiss 29 , 31 : Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint in conformity with this Order and the Court's previous Order 56 within 30 days of the date this Order is filed. (Kaminski, H)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/27/18, GRANTING IN PART, and DENYING IN PART 28 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall not file a second amended complaint until the Court issues an order on the two pending motions to dismiss. (Kastilahn, A)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 09/05/17 DENYING 14 Motion to Remand. (Benson, A.)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/7/2016 GRANTING plaintiffs an extension of time to file a First Amended Complaint until 11/23/2016.(Donati, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Way v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Way
Represented By: Kenley C. Dygert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Way
Represented By: Kenley C. Dygert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddy Way
Represented By: Kenley C. Dygert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: William J. Idleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Dennis O'Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: William J. Idleman
Represented By: Daniel Dennis O'Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC Financial Inc.
Represented By: Scott Matthew Nenni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?