Demarest v. The City of Vallejo California et al
Plaintiff: David P. Demarest
Defendant: The City of Vallejo California, Jodi Brown, Jeff Tai, Herman Robinson, Joseph Kreins and Andrew Bidou
Case Number: 2:2016cv02271
Filed: September 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/29/2020 DENYING Defendants' 75 Request for Bill of Costs. No costs will be taxed in this action.(Becknal, R)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/18/2020 GRANTING defendants' 58 Motion for Summary Judgment and DENYING plaintiff's 59 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment in Defendants' favor. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/28/18 ORDERING prior to filing any motion related to this stipulated protective order or other discovery motion, the parties shall first exhaust informal meet- and-confer efforts and otherwise comply with Local Rule 251; Nothing in this order limits the testimony of parties or non-parties, or the use of certain documents, at any court hearing or trial such determinations will only be made by the court at the hearing or trial, or upon an appropriate motion; Pursuant to Local Rule 141.1(f), the court will not retain jurisdiction over enforcement of the terms of this stipulated protective order after the action is terminated. (Becknal, R)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/31/18, GRANTING, retroactively, Plaintiff's 43 motion for a 42-day extension of time to designate experts. Expert witnesses shall be designated by 7/19/2018 and rebuttal experts shall be designated by 8/9/2018. (Kastilahn, A)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/14/2018 ORDERING that the deadline for discovery is EXTENDED through 9/14/2018. (Zignago, K.)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/19/2017 ORDERING: Initial Disclosures due by 1/3/2018; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 6/7/2018; Any rebuttal expert disclosures due by 7/5/2018; Discovery due by 8/9/2018; All law and m otion, except as to discovery-related matters, shall be completed 12/6/2018; Final Pretrial Conference is set for 1/21/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before District Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr; and a Bench Trial is set for 3/5/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before District Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. (Washington, S)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 8/25/17 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 25 are ADOPTED. Defendant's MOTION to DISMISS Plaintiff's first amended complaint 16 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's second, third, fourth, fifth, sixth, and tenth causes of action in his first amended complaint 13 are DISMISSED without leave to amend. Plaintiff's seventh and eighth causes of action in his first amended complaint (id.) are DISMISSED with leave to amend after discovery, subject to the limitations of FRCP 11. Plaintiff's request for punitive damages in his first amended complaint (id.) is STRICKEN. Plaintiff's first amended complaint PROCEEDS on his first and ninth causes of action. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/28/17 RECOMMENDING that Defendant's motion to dismiss plaintiff's first amended complaint 16 be GRANTED; Plaintiff's second, third, fourth, fifth, sixth , and tenth causes of action in his first amended complaint 13 be DISMISSED without leave to amend; Plaintiff's seventh and eighth causes of action in his first amended complaint (id.) be DISMISSED with leave to amend after discovery, subjec t to the limitations of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11; Plaintiff's request for punitive damages in his first amended complaint (id.) be STRICKEN; Plaintiff's first amended complaint PROCEED on his first and ninth causes of action. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr; Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Becknal, R)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 3/29/2017 ADOPTING 12 Findings and Recommendations; DISMISSING Defendants Joseph Kreins, Andrew Bidou from this action without leave to amend. (Michel, G.)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER and FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/17/2017 DENYING 6 Motion to Dismiss as it relates to the plaintiff's Fourth Amendment claim against Defendant Jodi Brown; DENYING 6 Motion to Dismiss wi th regard to all other claims asserted in the 1 Complaint; GRANTING the plaintiff leave to amend his complaint with regard to his dismissed claims against the City of Vallejo, Jodi Brown, Jeff Tai, and Herman Robinson; ORDERING the plaintiff to fil e within thirty (30) days, either an amended complaint, a statement that he desires to proceed on his original Fourth Amendment claim against Jodi Brown, or a request for voluntary dismissal; DENYING 4 Motion for Leave to File Electronically; RECOM MENDING that Defendants Joseph Kreins, Andrew Bidou be dismissed from this action without leave to amend; REFERRING this matter to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; ORDERING that any objections be filed and served within fourteen (14) days. (Michel, G.)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/27/2016 ORDERING that the hearing on defendants' 6 motion to dismiss is CONTINUED to 2/16/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Plaintiff shall file a written opposition to defendants' motion, or statement of non-opposition thereto, on or before 2/2/2017. Defendants may file a written reply to plaintiff's opposition, if any, on or before 2/9/2017. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Demarest v. The City of Vallejo California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David P. Demarest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Vallejo California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jodi Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Tai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herman Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Kreins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Bidou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?