Martinez v. Lizarraga et al.
Plaintiff: Joaquin Martinez
Defendant: J. Lizarraga, J. Carrillo, A. Jenkins and R. Giovacchini
Case Number: 2:2016cv02275
Filed: September 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/15/2017 ORDERING 13 this court adopted the F & R's 11 on 4/20/2017. Because the court has found plaintiff's action to be frivolous, the court HEREBY REVOKES Plaintiff's Forma Pauperis Status on Appeal. The Clerk of this Court shall forthwith forward a copy of this Order to the Clerk of the USCA for the Ninth Circuit. (cc: USCA #17-15946)(Reader, L)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 03/27/17 recommending that this action be dismissed. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/23/17 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of Joaquin Martinez and forward payment to the court until the balance is paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial)(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Lizarraga et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joaquin Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lizarraga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Carrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Giovacchini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?