Phan v. Jetblue Airways Corporation
Plaintiff: Xuan Thi Phan
Defendant: Jetblue Airways Corporation
Case Number: 2:2016cv02328
Filed: September 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/1/2018 APPROVING 79 Stipulation and DISMISSING Case with prejudice and without attorneys' fees, costs, or expenses to any party. CASE CLOSED. (York, M)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER DENYING defendant's 65 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/2/2018. (Kirksey Smith, K)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER re 68 Motion to Reinstate Case signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/11/2018: The court places this case back on calendar. As discussed at the hearing, by 6/18/2018, the parties are to file a joint stipulation setting new deadline s for expert discovery and dispositive motions. The Pretrial Conference remains set for 8/13/2018, and a Jury Trial remains set for 10/10/2018. Defendant's Request for Reconsideration by the District Court of Magistrate's Ruling 65 is set for hearing 7/9/2018 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 5. (Kirksey Smith, K)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/27/2017 GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 37 Motion to Compel. Defendant shall produce documents responses to plaintiff's RFP No. 1 on or before 12/29/2017. All other documents ordered produced by this order shall be produced on or before 1/12/2018. Discovery shall be completed by 4/30/2018. (York, M)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/8/2017 ORDERING that the requests to seal documents shall be made by motion before the same judge who will decide the matter related to that request to seal; any provision in the parties' stipulation that is in conflict with anything in this order is hereby DISAPPROVED. (Reader, L)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/28/2017 ORDERING 37 the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel is CONTINUED to 12/22/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes; and the parties shall file a joint statement that complies with the Local Rules and the Magistrate's Standard Information on or before 12/15/2017. (Reader, L)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/28/17: Request for entry of the proposed stipulated protective order 43 is denied without prejudice to renewal. (Kaminski, H)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 09/29/17 ORDERING that this case be RELATED to case number 2:17-cv-1604 WBS DB. (Benson, A.)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/20/2017 STRICKING 29 Motion to Amend the Complaint without prejudice. (Washington, S)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/8/17 ORDERING that the 2/13/2017 Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference is VACATED. Plaintiff shall disclose experts and produce reports by no later than 1/15/2018. D efendant shall disclose experts and reports by 2/15/2018. Expert rebuttal shall be disclosed and reports produced on or before 2/28/2018. Discovery shall be completed by 4/30/2018. Motions to compel discovery must be noticed before the magi strate judge's calendar to be heard not later than 4/30/2018. All motions, except motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders, or other emergency applications, shall be filed on or before 5/30/2018. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 8/13/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Jury Trial is SET for 10/10/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kastilahn, A)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER re Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's Request for Leave to Amend 18 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/21/2016: Plaintiff is granted leave to file her First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is ORDERED to promptly f ile her First Amended Complaint, Exhibit A to Document 16 (Document 16-1). Defendant is ORDERED to answer or respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint within 21 days of service of same, as agreed to by the Parties. The hearing calendared for 11/28/2016 at 1:30 pm is moot and hereby removed from the motion calendar. (Kirksey Smith, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phan v. Jetblue Airways Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jetblue Airways Corporation
Represented By: Shelley G. Hurwitz
Represented By: Sarah Gogal Passeri, PHV
Represented By: Steven Raffaele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xuan Thi Phan
Represented By: Alisa R. Brodkowitz, PHV
Represented By: Sean J. Gamble, PHV
Represented By: Glenn Guenard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?