Langston v. Karl
Plaintiff: Walter Shane Langston
Defendant: G Karl
Case Number: 2:2016cv02357
Filed: October 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/13/2018 ADVISING plaintiff that documents filed in this case since its closing date will be DISREGARDED and no further orders will issue. (Yin, K)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/08/17 recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/28/16 ordering the clerk of the court is directed to send plaintiff a copy of the endorsed original complaint submitted by plaintiff on 10/03/16 1 . Within 30 days after the filing date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the court 2 copies of the endorsed original complaint required to effect service. (Plummer, M)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/1/16 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of Walter Shane Langston and forward payment to the court until the balance is paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial)(Dillon, M)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/17/2016 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp or the $400.00 required fees; and the Clerk shall send plaintiff a new ifp application. (Yin, K) Modified on 10/17/2016 (Yin, K).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langston v. Karl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Shane Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Karl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?