Langston v. Tyler
Plaintiff: Walter Shane Langston
Defendant: Tyler
Case Number: 2:2016cv02358
Filed: October 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 08/17/17 recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/02/17 ordering the clerk of the court shall send plaintiff another blank USM-285 form, instruction sheet and copy of the 10/03/16 complaint to be completed and returned with the Notice of Submission of Documents within 30 days. (Plummer, M)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/28/16 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff one USM-284 form; and within 30 days after the filing date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the court the corr ected USM-285 form, a completed summons, and two copies of his original endorsed complaint filed October 3, 2016 (ECF No. 1 ). Failure to return the required documents within the specified time period will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed without prejudice.(Dillon, M)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/1/16 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of Walter Shane Langston and forward payment to the court until the balance is paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial)(Dillon, M)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/17/2016 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp or the $400.00 required fees; and the Clerk shall send plaintiff a new ifp application.(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langston v. Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Shane Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?