Mutter v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Cobb Laverne Mutter
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv02381
Filed: October 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/12/2018 DENYING 13 Motion for Summary Judgment, GRANTING 16 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, and AFFIRMING the final decision of the Commissioner. Judgment is entered for the Commissioner. CASE CLOSED. (York, M)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/12/2017 ORDERING Defendant's deadline to file Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED to 6/10/2017. (Washington, S)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/8/2017 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Opening Brief is EXTENDED to 4/8/2017. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mutter v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cobb Laverne Mutter
Represented By: Jacqueline Anna Forslund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Ann Lucille Maley
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?