Financial Pacific Insurance Company v. Mark Rite Lines Equipment Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Financial Pacific Insurance Company
Defendant: Mark Rite Lines Equipment Co., Inc., Axeman-Anderson Company and R.W. Beckett
Case Number: 2:2016cv02382
Filed: October 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/8/17, GRANTING Defendant Mark Rite Lines Equipment Co., Inc.'s 27 Motion for Order Establishing Good Faith Settlement. Plaintiff is to provide Defendant Mark Rite Lines Equipment Co., Inc. a full release of all claims in exchange for $12,500.00. Defendant Mark Rite Lines Equipment Co., Inc. is entitled to the protection of Code of Civil Procedure section 877.6 et seq. The settlement bars any pending or future claims by alleged joint tortfeasors or co- obligors against Defendant Mark Rite Lines Equipment Co., Inc., for equitable or implied indemnity, or contribution. (Kastilahn, A)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/27/17: The action is dismissed with prejudice as against Defendant Mark Rite Lines Equipment Co., Inc. Each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over this matter to enforce the terms of the June 30, 2017, Settlement Agreement. (Kaminski, H)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/20/17. All discovery shall be completed by 12/18/2017. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 2/15/2018. All dispositive motions, except motions for continuances, temporary rest raining orders or other emergency applications, shall be heard no later than 6/14/2018. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 9/20/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. The parties shall file, not later than 9/13/2018, a Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement. A Jury Trial is SET for 12/3/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. The parties estimate a trial length of seven (7) days.(Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Financial Pacific Insurance Company v. Mark Rite Lines Equipment Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Financial Pacific Insurance Company
Represented By: Minh N. Hoang
Represented By: Patricia Stephens Johnson, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Rite Lines Equipment Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axeman-Anderson Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.W. Beckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?