Munshower v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Judy Munshower
Defendant: United States of America
Unknown: City of Lodi
Case Number: 2:2016cv02386
Filed: October 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Placer
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/12/2018 MODIFYING the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order: Expert witness disclosures due 8/3/2018 with any supplemental disclosures by 8/17/2018; Discovery completed by 9/28/2018; Dis positive Motions due 11/6/2018 and heard on 12/4/2018 at 1:30PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez; Joint pretrial statement due 1/4/2019; Pretrial conference RESET for 1/11/2019 at 10:00AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez; Court Trial RESET for 2/25/2019 at 9:00AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. The scheduling set forth in the 11 Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order and all of its other provisions shall remain in full force and effect. (Fabillaran, J)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/28/17: Discovery cutoff: 4/30/2018. Dispositive Motions filing: 5/22/2018. Dispositive hearing: 6/19/2018 at 1:30 p.m. Joint pretrial statement due: 8/10/18. Final Pretrial Conference: 8/17/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. Bench Trial: 9/24/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Kaminski, H)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/4/2017 ORDERING Plaintiff Judy Munshower to submit to a medical examination on 10/10/2017 at 9:00am at the Federal Occupational Health Facility. (Donati, J)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED STIPULATION and ORDER TO EXTEND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE DEADLINES signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/18/17. The dates set forth in the 12/14/16 Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order, 11 are EXTENDED as follows: Expert Disclosure 10/31/20 17. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure 11/30/2017. Discovery cutoff: 1/31/2018. Dispositive Motion filing 3/13/2018. Dispositive Hearing set for 4/10/2018 at 01:30 PM. Joint Pretrial Statement due: 5/18/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/25/2018 at 10:00 AM. Trial SET for 7/9/2018 at 09:00 AM.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/7/2016 ORDERING that cases 2:16-CV-01163 JAM-DB, 2:16-CV-02386 JAM-DB, and 2:16-CV-02633 KJM-EFB. The action denominated 2:16-CV-02633 KJM-EFB is REASSIGNED to Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes for all further proceedings, and any dates currently set in this reassigned case only are hereby VACATED. The caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as 2:16-CV-02633 JAM-DB. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munshower v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Munshower
Represented By: Nicholas John Mastrangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: City of Lodi
Represented By: Kevin James Dehoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?