Howard v. County of Sacramento et al
Plaintiff: Semaj S Howard
Defendant: County of Sacramento, Robert Padilla and Stella Nze
Case Number: 2:2016cv02400
Filed: October 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/28/2018 GRANTING 15 Motion for Summary Judgment. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/27/2017 ORDERING that Plaintiffs Fourth and Fifth claims are hereby deemed abandoned; Stella Nze and Robert Padilla DISMISSED from action. (Hunt, G)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/1/17 ORDERING that the action denominated 2:17-cv-01807 is REASSIGNED to District Judge John A. Mendez for all further proceedings. And any dates currently set in the reassigned case onl y are hereby VACATED. The caption and documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as 2:17-cv-1807 JAM DB. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court make appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. County of Sacramento et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Semaj S Howard
Represented By: Kellan Steven Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stella Nze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?