Hardin v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.

Plaintiff: Shea Hardin
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv02432
Filed: October 12, 2016
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/25/2017 ORDERING that the expert discovery cut-off is CONTINUED to 2/23/2018. (Zignago, K.)
September 27, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/26/2017. (Washington, S)
August 16, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MODIFYING the 12/7/2016 Scheduling Order, signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/15/17. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 9/25/2017. Expert Discovery due by 11/24/2017. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 12/5/2017. The deadl ine to hear dispositive motions is CONTINUED to 1/16/2018, at 1:30 p.m. The deadline to file a joint pre-trial conference statement is CONTINUED to 3/2/2018. The Final Pretrial Conference is CONTINUED to 3/9/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. The Jury Trial is CONTINUED to 5/14/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez.(Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardin v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shea Hardin
Represented By: Scott Lee Fielder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Roger Backlar
Represented By: Charles D. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?