Hiemstra v. Credit One Bank

Plaintiff: Rhonda Hiemstra
Defendant: Credit One Bank
Case Number: 2:2016cv02437
Filed: October 12, 2016
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/16/2017 GRANTING 23 Stipulation and Proposed Order and the 10 Scheduling Order is modified as follows: Discovery cut off is CONTINUED to 2/2/2018; Dispositive Motions cut off is CONTINUED to 3/ 27/2018; Hearing such motions is CONTINED to 4/24/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez; Final Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 6/1/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez; Jury Trial CONTINUED to 7/16/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Washington, S)
September 15, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 09/14/17 DENYING defendant's 15 Motion to Stay; Defendant's Counsel is SANCTIONED $250 for violating this Court's Filing Requirements Order to be paid within 5 days. (Benson, A.)
May 25, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/25/17. Plaintiff's notice regarding hearing on a discovery disagreement 11 is denied w/o prejudice and the 5/31/17 hearing date is vacated. (Hinkle, T)
May 24, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/24/2017. (Zignago, K.)
March 7, 2017 10 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS (Pre-trial Scheduling) ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/6/17 ORDERING that all dispositive motions shall be filed by 12/22/2017. Hearing on such motions shall be on 1/16/2018 at 1:30 p.m.. All discovery shall be completed by 11/3/2017. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 9/1/2017 with rebuttal disclosures due by 9/8/2017. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 3/2/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. Jury Trial is SET for 4/16/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hiemstra v. Credit One Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Hiemstra
Represented By: Tammy L Hussin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit One Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?