Hernandez v. Rash Curtis & Associates

Plaintiff: Marlena Hernandez
Defendant: Rash Curtis & Associates
Case Number: 2:2016cv02455
Filed: October 14, 2016
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER signed by District Judge George H. Wu on 10/16/2017 CONTINUING hearing re 24 and 26 Motions for Summary Judgment to 11/13/2017 at 08:30 AM in Visiting Judge (TBD) before District Judge George H. Wu. (Zignago, K.)
September 21, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDER re Summary Judgment Motions signed by District Judge George H. Wu on 9/20/17. (Kaminski, H)
July 5, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge George H. Wu on 6/26/2017 GRANTING 16 Stipulation Extending Mediation Deadlines. Mediation Deadline CONTINUED to 8/28/2017 and Post-Mediation Status Conference CONTINUED to 8/31/2017 at 08:30 AM before District Judge George H. Wu. Plaintiff's 17 Motion to Appear by Telephone is DEEMED MOOT. (Donati, J)
December 21, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDER signed by District Judge George H. Wu on 12/20/16. (Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Rash Curtis & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlena Hernandez
Represented By: Trinette Gragirena Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rash Curtis & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?