Van Hulten v. ABBA Bail Bonds, Inc.

Plaintiff: Adam Van Hulten
Defendant: ABBA Bail Bonds, Inc. and Jane Un
Case Number: 2:2016cv02459
Filed: October 14, 2016
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/2/2017 GRANTING 31 Motion to Compel as follows: Defendant Un shall serve Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's First Sets of Requests for Production of Documents and Interrogatories no later than 10/6/2017. Sanctions are imposed against defendant Un and must be paid to plaintiff's counsel in the amount of $750, along with outstanding sanctions in the amount of $2,250, by 10/6/2017. (Zignago, K.)
September 26, 2017 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 09/22/17 GRANTING 19 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and ORDERING that Defendant Jane Un may appear in propria persona. Local Rule 183(a), however, states that, "[a] corporation or other entity may appear only by an attorney." Defendant Abba, therefore, may NOT appear in propria persona. Accordingly, Abba has 45 to acquire new representation. Defendant Un is ORDERED TO APPEAR at the next scheduled hearing in this matter, on 09/27/17 at 10:00 AM, before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney, in person in Courtroom 24 or telephonically by contacting Magistrate Judge Delaney's chambers in advance of the hearing. (Benson, A.)
August 25, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/24/17 11/10/2017 ORDERING that the deadline for Plaintiff to file his Motions for Class Certification be extended from 9/21/17 to 11/16/2017; and that the Court's precertification discovery deadline be extended from 9/11/17 to 11/10/17. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 11, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/11/17, ORDERING that Plaintiff's 18 motion to compel and for sanctions is GRANTED. Defendants shall serve supplemental responses to plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Product ion of Documents and Interrogatories, including production of all responsive documents, no later than 8/16/2017. Sanctions are imposed against defendants and must be paid to Plaintiff's counsel in the amount of $2,250 by 8/16/2017. (Kastilahn, A)
July 5, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/30/2017 ORDERING the plaintiff to file his Motions for Class Certification by 9/21/2017; CONTINUING the Court's precertification discovery deadline to 9/11/2017. (Michel, G.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Hulten v. ABBA Bail Bonds, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Van Hulten
Represented By: David Douglas Deason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABBA Bail Bonds, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Un
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?