Prime Healthcare Services-Shasta, LLC v. Burwell
Plaintiff: Prime Healthcare Services-Shasta, LLC and Shasta Regional Medical Center
Defendant: Burwell and Sylvia Mathews Burwell
Case Number: 2:2016cv02521
Filed: October 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M Kellison
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
2 Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/9/2018 ORDERING the following actions are consolidated for all purposes, including trial and all pretrial matters: 2:14-cv-02791-TLN-KJN; 2:15-cv-00154-TLN-KJN; 2:15-cv-00324-TLN-KJN; 2:15-cv-00400-TLN-KJN; 2:15-cv-00450-TLN-KJN; 2:15-cv-00473-TLN-KJN; 2:15-cv-00474-TLN-KJN;. 2:15-cv-00709-TLN-KJN; 2:15-cv-01120-TLN-KJN; 2:16-cv-00230-TLN-KJN; 2:16-cv-02278-TLN-KJN; and 2:16-cv-02521-TLN-KJN; Plaintiff shall have seven (7) days from the date this Order is entered to file the Proposed consolidated Complaint. That filing shall be docketed solely on the docket for Case No. 2:14-cv-02791-TLN-KJN. Going forward no filing should be made under any of the other case numbers listed in the preceding paragraph; Defendant shall have forty-five (45) days after service of the Proposed Consolidated Complaint to file an answer. (Becknal, R)
December 27, 2017 Filing 21 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Gregory T. Broderick for Sylvia Mathews Burwell, attorney Bobbie J. Montoya, cv terminated (Broderick, Gregory)
December 19, 2017 Filing 20 MOTION to CONSOLIDATE Related Actions and Extend Time for Filing Amended Complaint by Prime Healthcare Services-Shasta, LLC. Attorney Farag, Shareef added. Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Farag, Shareef) Modified on 12/29/2017 (Zignago, K.).
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/19/17 ORDERING that the Motion to Consolidate Cases #18 is DENIED without prejudice. However, as the parties agree that attorneys for Plaintiff need time to familiarize themselves with this case, Plaintiff may file a Motion to Consolidate attaching its proposed amended complaint as an exhibit within sixty (60) days of the date this Order is filed. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 4, 2017 Filing 18 MOTION to CONSOLIDATE CASES and MOTION for EXTENSION of TIME to File Amended Complaint by Prime Healthcare Services-Shasta, LLC. Attorney Pearson, Matthew D. added. Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Pearson, Matthew)
August 14, 2017 Filing 17 PROPOSED SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Prime Healthcare Services-Shasta, LLC. (Romero, Samuel)
August 14, 2017 Filing 16 PROPOSED SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Prime Healthcare Services-Shasta, LLC. (Romero, Samuel)
May 25, 2017 Filing 15 REPLY by Sylvia Mathews Burwell to RESPONSE to #12 MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION . (Montoya, Bobbie)
May 11, 2017 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Courtroom Deputy M. Caspar for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/11/2017: The court is in receipt of defendants motion dismiss #12 and plaintiffs opposition to that motion #13 . On the courts own motion, defendants motion is taken under submission on the papers, and the 6/1/2017 hearing before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman is VACATED. Defendant may file a reply, if any, by no later than 5/25/2017. If, after reviewing the parties submissions, the court finds a hearing on defendants motion would materially aid in the courts resolution of that filing, the court will set such a hearing on its own motion.(TEXT ONLY) (Caspar, M)
May 4, 2017 Filing 13 OPPOSITION by Prime Healthcare Services-Shasta, LLC to #12 MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION . (Romero, Samuel)
April 6, 2017 Filing 12 MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION ( Motion Hearing set for 6/1/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman.), MOTION to DISMISS by Sylvia Mathews Burwell. Attorney Montoya, Bobbie J. added. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Montoya, Bobbie)
March 24, 2017 Filing 11 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sylvia Mathews Burwell by Prime Healthcare Services-Shasta, LLC. (Romero, Samuel)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/20/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff may file a Second Amended Complaint in each of the following three related cases: Prime Healthcare Services - Shasta, LLC v. Burwell, Case No. 2:16-cv-00230-TLN-KJN; Prime Healthcare Services - Shasta, LLC v. Burwell, Case No. 2:16-cv-02278-TLN-KJN; and Prime Healthcare Services - Shasta, LLC v. Burwell, Case No. 2:16-cv-02521-TLN-KJN.
March 10, 2017 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Amend #7 the First Amended Complaint and Set a Briefing Schedule for Motions to Dismiss by Prime Healthcare Services-Shasta, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Romero, Samuel) Modified on 3/13/2017 (Kastilahn, A).
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/15/2016 REFERRING all pending Motion to Dismiss in the LEAD action and the RELATED CASES to Magistrate Judge Newman for Findings and Recommendations; ADDITIONALLY the Court ORDERS that all future motions to dismiss or motions to amend be noticed before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman.(Reader, L)
November 22, 2016 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sylvia Mathews Burwell by Prime Healthcare Services-Shasta, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Romero, Samuel) Modified on 11/23/2016 (Washington, S).
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RELATING CASES signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/21/2016 ORDERING that cases 2:14-cv-02791-TLN-KJN, 2:16-cv-02521-TLN-CMK, and 2:16-cv-02278-VC are RELATED. The actions denominated 2:16-cv-02521-TLN-CMK and 2:16-cv-02278-VC are hereby REASSIGNED to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Kendall Newman for all further proceedings. Any dates currently set in the reassigned cases are hereby VACATED. The caption on documents filed in the reassigned cases shall be shown as: 2:16-cv-02521-TLN-KJN and 2:16-cv-02278-TLN-KJN, respectively. The case denominated 2:14-cv-02791-TLN-KJN is designated the lead case for the purposes of relating any future cases. (Zignago, K.)
November 18, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:14-cv-02791, 2:15-cv-00154, 2:15-cv-00324, 2:15-cv-00400, 2:15-cv-00450, 2:15-cv-00473, 2:15-cv-00474, 2:15-cv-00709, 2:15-cv-01120, 2:16-cv-00230, 2:16-cv-02278 by Prime Healthcare Services-Shasta, LLC. (Romero, Samuel)
November 9, 2016 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Prime Healthcare Services-Shasta, LLC. Attorney Romero, Samuel Joel added. Sylvia Mathews Burwell served on 11/7/2016, answer due 1/6/2017. (Romero, Samuel)
October 24, 2016 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A)
October 24, 2016 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Sylvia Mathews Burwell* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Bryan Wong* *3300 East Guasti Road* *Third Floor* *Ontario, CA 91761*. (Benson, A)
October 21, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Request for Jury Trial against Sylvia Mathews Burwell by Prime Healthcare Services-Shasta, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-6737563) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hodges, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prime Healthcare Services-Shasta, LLC v. Burwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia Mathews Burwell
Represented By: Gregory T. Broderick
Represented By: Bobbie Jo Montoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prime Healthcare Services-Shasta, LLC
Represented By: Matthew D. Pearson
Represented By: Bryan Wong
Represented By: Ronald S. Hodges
Represented By: Troy Allyn Schell
Represented By: Shareef Farag
Represented By: Samuel Joel Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shasta Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew D. Pearson
Represented By: Bryan Wong
Represented By: Ronald S. Hodges
Represented By: Troy Allyn Schell
Represented By: Shareef Farag
Represented By: Samuel Joel Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?