In Re: Gary William Gorski
Debtor: Gary William Gorski
Trustee: David Cusick, Kimberly Husted, Thomas A. Aceituno, John R. Roberts, Douglas M. Whatley and Office of the U.S. Trustee (Sac)
Appellant: Daniel Karalash and Robert Hunter
Cross_defendant: Howard Eley, County of Sacramento, County of Yolo and Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 2:2016cv02528
Filed: October 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: George H. Wu
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER RE REMAINING INTERPLEAD FUNDS before District Judge George H. Wu on 6/13/2017 ORDERING This Court granted the IRS's motion for summary judgment and held that: "Gorski is entitled to $98,725.50 in attorney's fees awarded to Robert Hunter in Hunter et al., v. County of Sacramento"; "[IRS's] tax liens attach to Gary Gorski's entire interest in the attorney's fees awarded to Robert Hunter in Hunter et al., v. County of Sacramento"; and " the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court for the EDCA shall pay $98,725.50 currently in the Bankruptcy Court's registry in connection with the Adversary Proceeding No. 14-2016 for application toward the unpaid Federal income tax liabilities of Ga ry Gorski"; In the appeal of the Bankruptcy Court's order approving the compromise as to Eley's half of the attorney's fees, this Court affirmed that order; It has now come to the Court's attention that, after issuing order s regarding the allocation of the interplead funds, there remains the sum of approximately $3,577.93 with interest accruing; The Court ORDERS the clerk to give notice to the parties in both Case(s) 16CV2528 and 16CV2611 of said amount and that said parties will have until 7/5/2017, to file a claim as to those funds; A Hearing is set for 7/10/2017 at 08:30 AM, before District Judge George H. Wu.(Reader, L)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by District Judge George H. Wu on 6/2/2017 ORDERING, in light of the oral argument at the 6/1/2017 hearing, the Court will adopt its tentative as its final. The Court AFFIRMS the Bankruptcy Court's order (or approves of the Bankruptcy Court's report and recommendation as reflected in its oral ruling). CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by District Judge George H. Wu on 02/08/17 ORDERING that the 8 Motion to Change Venue is DENIED and the 02/13/17 hearing is VACATED. (Benson, A)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER signed by District Judge George H. Wu on 12/20/2016 re: 6 Transfer of Case. (Michel, G.)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/22/2016 RECUSING himself as the judge assigned to this case; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to reassign this case to another judge; CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. for all further proceedings; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to make the appropriate adjustments in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for such reassignment. New case number: 2:16-cv-02528 MCE (BK). (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Gary William Gorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Gary William Gorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: David Cusick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Kimberly Husted
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Thomas A. Aceituno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: John R. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Douglas M. Whatley
Represented By: J. Russell Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee (Sac)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Daniel Karalash
Represented By: Lori Mark Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Robert Hunter
Represented By: Lori Mark Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Howard Eley
Represented By: Estela Olivia Pino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: County of Sacramento
Represented By: Thomas Allen Cregger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: County of Yolo
Represented By: Kevin James Dehoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Boris Kukso, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?