Blackshire v. Sacramento County Sheriff
Plaintiff: Patrick Blackshire
Defendant: Sacramento County Sheriff
Case Number: 2:2016cv02537
Filed: October 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/27/2018 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without leave to amend. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Huang, H)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/11/2018 DENYING plaintiff's 18 request for appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 06/27/18 ORDERING because plaintiff did not sign the 21 amended complaint it will be disregarded. Within 30 days, plaintiff may file an amended complaint that is signed.(Plummer, M)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/18/2018 ADOPTING 19 Findings and Recommendations in full. Plaintiff's 18 Motion for Reconsideration is GRANTED and the Clerk is directed to VACATE the 16 Order and 17 Judgment and REOPEN the case. The Clerk is directed to re-serve plaintiff with a copy of the court's 15 screening order. Plaintiff is GRANTED 30 days to file an amended complaint. (Zignago, K.)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/1/2018 ORDERING the Clerk to randomly assign a US District Judge to this action. IT IS RECOMMENDED plaintiff's 18 motion for reconsideration be granted and the Clerk be directed to vacate the 9/13/2017 order and judgment, and reopen the case; the Clerk be directed to re-serve plaintiff a copy of the court's 8/2/2017 screening order; plaintiff be granted 30 days from any order adopting these findings and recommendations to file an amended complaint. Assigned and referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/12/2017 DISMISSING this action without prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Henshaw, R)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/2/2017 GRANTING 9 Motion to Proceed IFP; DENYING 11 , 12 , and 13 Request for Judicial Orders; and DISMISSING 1 Complaint with leave to amend within 30 days. (Henshaw, R)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/5/2016 DENYING plaintiff's 5 request to Proceed IFP, without prejudice. The Clerk shall send plaintiff a new ifp form. Plaintiff has 30 days to submit the properly completed application.(Yin, K)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/31/2016 DENYING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. The Clerk of the court is directed to send to plaintiff a new form Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Butolph, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackshire v. Sacramento County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Blackshire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?