Mann v. Mutual of Omaha

Plaintiff: Donald Mann
Defendant: Mutual Of Omaha
Case Number: 2:2016cv02560
Filed: October 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/8/2019 DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, pursuant to FRCP 41(A). Each party shall bear their own attorney's fees and costs. CASE CLOSED (Reader, L)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/05/18 CONTINUING Trial and Pretrial dates: Expert Disclosure due by 12/3/2018. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure due by 1/4/2019; Discovery cutoff 3/4/2019; Last date to file Motions 3/18/2019. Pretrial Conference SET for 6/10/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Trial SET for 8/13/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/18/18 ORDERING that the Pretrial Scheduling Order of this Court should be, and is hereby MODIFIED as follows: Expert Disclosure due by 10/1/2018. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure 11/1/18. Discovery Cutoff 1/4/2019. Last day to file Motions 1/18/2019. Pretrial Conference CONTINUED from 2/11/19 to 4/15/2019 at 01:30 PM. Trial CONTINUED from 4/9/19 to 6/11/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/13/18, ORDERING that the pretrial scheduling order is modified as follows: designation of expert witnesses due 8/27/2018, rebuttal expert disclosure due 10/1/2018, discovery cuto ff is 11/2/2018, last day to file motions is 11/19/2018. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 2/11/2019 at 01:30 PM, and the Jury Trial is SET for 4/9/2019 at 09:00 AM, BOTH in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kastilahn, A)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 11/21/17: Expert Disclosure due by 2/23/2018. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure due by 3/26/18. Discovery due by 4/20/2018. Last day to file motions is 5/1/2018. (Kaminski, H)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 04/20/17 ORDERING that defendant's 19 Motion to Dismiss plaintiff's amended IIED claim is GRANTED. Plaintiff's amended IIED claim is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (Benson, A)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/11/2017 GRANTING 24 Plaintiffs' Request to appear telephonically at the motion to dismiss hearing set for 4/17/2017 at 1:30 p.m. The courtroom deputy shall email counsel with instructions on how to participate in the telephone conference call. (Kirksey Smith, K)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/9/2017 re 7 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss: IT IS ORDERED that defendant's motion to dismiss plaintiff's Complaint be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Plaintiff has twenty days from the date this Order is signed to file a first amended complaint, if he can do so consistent with this Order. (Kirksey Smith, K)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/30/2017 GRANTING 11 defendant's counsel's Request to appear by telephone at the 2/6/2017 motion hearing set for 1:30 p.m. The courtroom deputy shall email counsel with instructions on how to participate in the telephone conference call. (Kirksey Smith, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mann v. Mutual of Omaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Mann
Represented By: Cathleen Theresa Barr
Represented By: John Dugan Douglas Barr
Represented By: Estee Lewis
Represented By: Troy Douglas Mudford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mutual Of Omaha
Represented By: Ophir Johna
Represented By: Martin E. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?