McFarland v. State of California
Petitioner: Douglas Scott McFarland
Respondent: State of California
Case Number: 2:2016cv02568
Filed: October 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/6/2017 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/5/2017 ORDERING, within 21 days, petitioner shall file either an opposition to the motion to dismiss or a statement of no opposition. Failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed without prejudice. (Yin, K)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/09/17 ordering petitioners request for an extension of time, construed as a motion for relief from judgment pursuant to Rule 60(b) 9 , is granted. The clerk is directed to reopen this case. Pe titioners request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis 10 is granted. Respondent shall file and serve either an answer or a motion in response to petitioners application within 60 days from the date of this order. Petitioners reply, if any, shal l be filed and served within 30 days of service of an answer. If the response to petitioners application is a motion, petitioners opposition or statement of non-opposition shall be filed and served within 30 days of service of the motion, and respon dents reply, if any, shall be filed within 14 days thereafter. The Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this order together with a copy of petitioners petition for writ of habeas corpus 1 with any and all attachments on Michael Patrick Farrell, Senior Assistant Attorney General for the State of California. The Clerk of the Court also shall serve on the Senior Assistant Attorney General the consent form used in this court. (cc: Michael Farrell, Attorney General). (Plummer, M) Modified on 2/9/2017 (Plummer, M).
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/5/2016 DISMISSING this action, without prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Yin, K)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/31/16 ORDERING that petitioner shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis or the appropriate filing fee; petitioners failure to comply with this order may result in this action being dismissed; and Clerk of the Court is directed to send petitioner a copy of the in forma pauperis form used by this district.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McFarland v. State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Douglas Scott McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?