County of Sacramento v. Gorski et al
Plaintiff: County of Sacramento
Defendant: Gary Gorski, Robert Hunter, Howard Eley, Douglas Whatley, Internal Revenue Service, Yolo County, Daniel Karalash and Franchise Tax Board
Counter_defendant: County of Sacramento, County of Yolo, Howard Eley, Robert Hunter, Internal Revenue Service, Douglas Whatley and Daniel Karalash
Cross_defendant: County of Sacramento, County of Yolo, Howard Eley, Robert Hunter, Internal Revenue Service, Douglas Whatley, Franchise Tax Board and Daniel Karalash
Cross_claimant: Douglas Whatley, Gary Gorski and Gary W Gorski
Trustee: Douglas Whatley and Office of the U.S. Trustee (Sac)
Case Number: 2:2016cv02611
Filed: November 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: George H. Wu
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DIRECTING FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF INTERPLEADER FUNDS signed by District Judge George H. Wu on 9/27/2017. (cc BK Clerk, BK Judge Kline) (Washington, S)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER RE REMAINING INTERPLEAD FUNDS before District Judge George H. Wu on 6/13/2017 ORDERING This Court granted the IRS's motion for summary judgment and held that: "Gorski is entitled to $98,725.50 in attorney's fees awarded to Robert Hunter in Hunter et al, v. County of Sacramento"; "[IRS's] tax liens attach to Gary Gorski's entire interest in the attorney's fees awarded to Robert Hunter in Hunter et al., v. County of Sacramento"; and "t he Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court for the EDCA shall pay $98,725.50 currently in the Bankruptcy Court's registry in connection with the Adversary Proceeding No. 14-2016 for application toward the unpaid Federal income tax liabilities of Gar y Gorski"; In the appeal of the Bankruptcy Court's order approving the compromise as to Eley's half of the attorney's fees, this Court affirmed that order; It has now come to the Court's attention that, after issuing orders regarding the allocation of the interplead funds, there remains the sum of approximately $3,577.93 with interest accruing; The Court ORDERS the clerk to give notice to the parties in both Case(s) 16CV2528 and 16CV2611 of said amount and that said parties will have until 7/5/2017, to file a claim as to those funds; A Hearing is set for 7/10/2017 at 08:30 AM, before District Judge George H. Wu. (Reader, L)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by District Judge George H. Wu on 5/17/2017 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of California shall pay $98,725.50 currently in the Bankruptcy Courts registry in connection with the Adversa ry Proceeding No. 14-2016 for application toward the unpaid Federal income tax liabilities of Gary Gorski. The payment shall be made without reduction of any registry fees. The check shall be made payable to the United States Department of Justice and sent to: William Thompson, Office of Review, Dept. of Justice, Tax Division, P.O. Box 310 Washington, DC 20044. CASE CLOSED (Becknal, R)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STANDING ORDER signed by District Judge George H. Wu on 2/15/2017 re 19 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Jackson, T)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by District Judge George H. Wu on 01/12/2017 GRANTING 1 Motion to Withdraw Reference. A Status Conference is set for 2/2/2017 at 08:30 AM before District Judge George H. Wu; Parties will file a joint status report by noon on 1/31/2017; Telephone appearances are allowed provided notice is given to the clerk two business days prior to the hearing. (Jackson, T)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER signed by District Judge George H. Wu on 12/20/2016. (Michel, G.)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER signed by District Judge George H. Wu on 12/20/2016 re: 8 Transfer of Case. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Sacramento v. Gorski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Sacramento
Represented By: Thomas Allen Cregger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Gorski
Represented By: Matthew R. Eason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hunter
Represented By: Lori Mark Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Eley
Represented By: Joseph F Klatt
Represented By: Estela Olivia Pino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Whatley
Represented By: J. Russell Cunningham
Represented By: Jeremy Luke Hendrix
Represented By: Gabriel P Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Boris Kukso, GOVT
Represented By: Rika Valdman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolo County
Represented By: Kevin James Dehoff
Represented By: Boris Kukso, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Karalash
Represented By: Lori Mark Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franchise Tax Board
Represented By: Melody Tse Scullary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: County of Sacramento
Represented By: Thomas Allen Cregger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: County of Yolo
Represented By: Kevin James Dehoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Howard Eley
Represented By: Joseph F Klatt
Represented By: Estela Olivia Pino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Robert Hunter
Represented By: Lori Mark Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Boris Kukso, GOVT
Represented By: Rika Valdman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Douglas Whatley
Represented By: J. Russell Cunningham
Represented By: Jeremy Luke Hendrix
Represented By: Gabriel P Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Daniel Karalash
Represented By: Lori Mark Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: County of Sacramento
Represented By: Thomas Allen Cregger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: County of Yolo
Represented By: Kevin James Dehoff
Represented By: Kevin James Dehoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Howard Eley
Represented By: Joseph F Klatt
Represented By: Estela Olivia Pino
Represented By: Joseph F Klatt
Represented By: Estela Olivia Pino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Robert Hunter
Represented By: Lori Mark Porter
Represented By: Lori Mark Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Boris Kukso, GOVT
Represented By: Rika Valdman
Represented By: Boris Kukso, GOVT
Represented By: Rika Valdman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Douglas Whatley
Represented By: J. Russell Cunningham
Represented By: Jeremy Luke Hendrix
Represented By: Gabriel P Herrera
Represented By: J. Russell Cunningham
Represented By: Jeremy Luke Hendrix
Represented By: Gabriel P Herrera
Represented By: J. Russell Cunningham
Represented By: Jeremy Luke Hendrix
Represented By: Gabriel P Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Franchise Tax Board
Represented By: Melody Tse Scullary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Daniel Karalash
Represented By: Lori Mark Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Douglas Whatley
Represented By: J. Russell Cunningham
Represented By: Jeremy Luke Hendrix
Represented By: Gabriel P Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Gary Gorski
Represented By: Matthew R. Eason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Gary W Gorski
Represented By: Matthew R. Eason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Douglas Whatley
Represented By: J. Russell Cunningham
Represented By: Jeremy Luke Hendrix
Represented By: Gabriel P Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee (Sac)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?