Simmons v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Tharon Simmons
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv02612
Filed: November 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Yuba
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 07/09/18 ORDERING defendant pay plaintiffs attorney fees of $6,500. (Benson, A.)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/21/18: Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 19 is granted. The Commissioner's cross-motion for summary judgment 22 is denied. This matter is remanded for additional administrative proceedings. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in plaintiff's favor and close the case. (Kaminski, H)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/25/17 ORDERING that the deadline for Defendant to file her response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED thirty (30) days to 5/30/2017. All other deadlines and scheduling matters set forth in the Court's Scheduling Order dated 11/3/16, remain the same. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/3/2016 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. The Clerk is directed to issue process. Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the United States Marshal an original and 5 copies of the completed summons, 5 copies of the complaint, and 5 copies of the scheduling order, and shall file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the United States Marshal. (Jackson, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tharon Simmons
Represented By: Melissa Markos Nyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: C. Hay-Mie Cho
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?