Hoeft v. Ballon
Plaintiff: Monica Hoeft
Defendant: Al Ballon
Case Number: 2:2016cv02615
Filed: November 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/28/2020 DENYING 70 Motion to Set Aside the Judgment. (Reader, L)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 AMENDED 49 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/12/18 ORDERING that Defendant Ballon's motion to dismiss (ECF No. 43 ) is GRANTED; and this action is DISMISSED with prejudice. (Becknal, R)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/12/2018 DENYING 56 Motion for leave to file a late transcript designation at government's expense. (Washington, S)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/29/17 DENYING 51 Motion for Reconsideration. (Benson, A.)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/3/17 ORDERING that Defendant Ballon's motion to dismiss (ECF No. 43 ) is GRANTED; and this action is DISMISSED with prejudice. CASE CLOSED(Becknal, R)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/21/2017 GRANTING 34 Motion to Dismiss; DISMISSING the 16 First Amended Complaint for failure to state a claim; GRANTING the plaintiff thirty days to file an amended complaint; CAUTIONING the plaintiff that a failure to file an amended complaint in accordance with this order will result in a recommendations that this action be dismissed. (Michel, G.)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/28/2017 ORDERING that no later than 5/26/2017, plaintiff shall provide a properly filled out USM-285 form, including all information needed by the United States Marshal to effect service of pr ocess under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i). Plaintiff shall also file with the court a copy of the USM-285 form submitted to the United States Marshal. Failure to comply with this order shall result in dismissal of this action without prejudice. (Zignago, K.)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/14/2017 ORDERING the plaintiff to submit to the U.S. Marshal, by 4/28/2017, a properly completed USM-285 form and to file a copy of said form with the court; CAUTIONING the plaintiff that a failure to comply with this order will result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice. (Michel, G.)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 03/29/17 ORDERING that, by 04/14/17, plaintiff shall file copies of all documents submitted to USM per 24 Amended Statement of Submission and 17 Order. (Benson, A)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/28/2017 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court reassign this case to the Honorable Carolyn K. Delaney. The parties shall please take note that all documents hereafter filed with the Clerk of the Court shall bear case No. 2:16-cv-2615 CKD PS. All currently scheduled dates presently set before Judge Mueller are hereby VACATED. (Zignago, K.)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/8/2017 ORDERING the order filed 2/7/2017 is VACATED and this case is REOPENED. The Clerk of Court is directed to list on the court's docket Al Ballon as defendant. The Commissioner of Soci al Security is DISMISSED pursuant to plaintiff's amended complaint. Within 28 days from the date of this order, all information needed by the Marshal to effect service of process, including all information required for proper service of summons under Fed. R. of Civ. P. 4(i) and shall file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the USM, along with a copy of the information provided to the Marshal. The USM is DIRECTED to serve all process without prepayment of c osts not later than 90 days from the date of this order. The Clerk of the Court shall send plaintiff one USM-285 form, one summons, and a copy of the 16 amended complaint. In the event the USM is unable, for any reason whatsoever, to effectuate service on defendant Ballon within 90 days from the date of this order, the Marshal is DIRECTED to report that fact, and the reasons for it, to the undersigned. (cc: USM) (Washington, S) Modified on 2/9/2017 (Washington, S).
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/7/2017 DISMISSING CASE without prejudice, pursuant to FRCP 41(b). CASE CLOSED(Reader, L)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/5/17: Plaintiff's motion 11 is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to change the nature of suit code to a civil rights action and assign a District Judge to this action. The scheduling order 5 is vacated. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed. Plaintiff is granted thirty days from the date of service of this order to file an amended complaint. (Kaminski, H)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/1/16 DENYING 8 Request for Al Ballon, in his individual capacity, to be added as a defendant and summons issued filed by Monica Hoeft. (Washington, S)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/8/2016 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to serve the 5 Scheduling Order in Social Security Cases; ORDERING the plaintiff to submit to the U.S. Marshal, within fourteen days, a completed 4 Summons and copies of the 1 Social Security Complaint and to file statement of such service with the court; DIRECTING the U.S. Marshal to serve all process without prepayment of costs within sixty days. (cc: U.S. Marshal) (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoeft v. Ballon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Hoeft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Ballon
Represented By: Gregory T. Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?