Westfall v. Ball Metal Beverage Container Corporation
Plaintiff: Robert Westfall
Defendant: Ball Metal Beverage Container Corporation
Case Number: 2:2016cv02632
Filed: November 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/29/2019 GRANTING in PART 91 Motion for Relief from 10-Deposition Limit. (Washington, S)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/28/19 ORDERING the Parties shall submit the discovery dispute referenced in the above stipulation, for resolution by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney pursuant to Civil Local Rule 251; All cu rrent pre-trial deadlines are vacated; and Within fourteen (14) days of Judge Delaney's ruling on the Parties' discovery dispute, the Parties shall submit a joint report re pre-trial schedule, to include dates for fact and expert discovery cutoff, motion cutoffs, and trial. (Becknal, R)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/14/2019 IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's 76 ) Motion is deemed WITHDRAWN, without prejudice for Defendant to seek similar or related relief in the future. Within 14 days of the Court's ruling on 59 Plaintiffs' pending Motion for Reconsideration, Defendant shall provide Plaintiffs with a proposed class discovery plan, to include proposals regarding the number, length, and anticipated topics of class member depositions. Within 14 days of receiving Defendant's plan, Plaintiffs shall give a written response indicating whether they agree to the plan or whether, if they dispute any aspect of it, and the factual basis for any such dispute. (Reader, L)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/24/18 WITHDRAWING 76 Motion to Compel. (Kaminski, H)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 JOINT FURTHER SCHEDULING STIPULAION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/13/2018 ORDERING that: 76 Motion to Compel is off-calendar. Defendant may submit a motion seeking relief from discovery limits on or before 8/24/2018; T he Court will defer ruling on 56 Motion for Reconsideration until after 8/17/2018; The Deadline for parties to report to the Court regarding the status of mediation and settlement due by 8/17/2018; Fact Discovery deadline CONTINUED to 11/30/2018; D isclosure of expert witnesses/signed reports CONTINUED to 12/28/2018; Supplemental expert witness disclosures CONTINUED to 1/25/2019; Completion of expert discovery CONTINUED to 2/22/2019; and Deadline for hearing on dispositive motions CONTINUED to 3/29/2019. (Hunt, G)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 JOINT FURTHER SCHEDULING STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/4/18 ORDERING that the deadlines for Defendant to file Motions to Compel a trial plan, are continued to 6/8/18. By 6/1/18, the Parties shall file a joint report on the status of scheduling a further mediation, including whether any further continuances of the 6/8/18 deadline are warranted. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/2/2018 GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 27 Motion to Certify Class. As to the 1st, 2nd, 3rd, 6th and 7th claims, the court finds plaintiffs have satisfied the requirements of Rule 23(a) and (b) to allow class certification. The court therefore GRANTS IN PART plaintiffs' motion for class certification as to these claims, and otherwise DENIES the motion. (York, M)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 SCHEDULING STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/13/2017 APPROVING the parties' proposal except that the Further Status Conference is set for 1/18/2018, at 02:30 PM, in Courtroom 3 (KJM), before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. All other dates contained within the 15 Order are VACATED. (York, M)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 08/10/17 ORDERING that the 35 Request to Seal Document is DENIED without prejudice to refiling of a properly supported request by Ball. If any party to this action again files such an unsupported request to seal, the court cautions it will be required to show cause why it should not be subject to monetary sanctions. (Benson, A.)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/29/2017 ORDERING the plaintiff to file a Motion for Class Certification by 7/28/2017; ORDERING the defendants to file an opposition to said motion by 8/28/2017; ORDERING the plaintiff to file any reply be 9/12/2017; ORDERING that the Motion for Class Certification be noticed for hearing on 9/22/2017 at 10:00 AM. (Michel, G.)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/30/17. (Kaminski, H)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER: CLASS CERTIFICATION PHASE signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/6/17: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 1/31/2018. Discovery due by 12/31/2017. Class Certification Motion shall be filed by 6/30/1 7. Opposition, if any, shall be filed by 7/28/17. Reply to Opposition, if any, shall be filed by 8/11/17. Hearing on Motion is set for 9/8/17, at 10:00 a.m. Further Status Conference set for 1/4/2018 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westfall v. Ball Metal Beverage Container Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Westfall
Represented By: Matthew R. Eason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ball Metal Beverage Container Corporation
Represented By: Christopher M. Ahearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?